United States of America v. Kathy Jo Leydekkers
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: KATHY JO LEYDEKKERS and Kathy Christenson
Case Number: 8:2020cv01243
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:3205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order on Motion for Garnishment,, #9 , Writ of Garnishment #10 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #11 , APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment Kathy Jo Leydekkers AS TO GARNISHEES COMERICA BANK AND SCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] #7 SERVICE TO DEFENDANT BY U.S. MAIL served on 8/17/2020. (Lester, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Notice of Continuing Garnishment #6 , Order, #4 , Writ of Garnishment #5 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 SERVICE TO DEFENDANT BY U.S. MAIL served on 8/17/2020. (Lester, Robert)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order on Motion for Garnishment,, #9 , Writ of Garnishment #10 SERVICE ON GARNISHEES BY CERTIFIED MAIL served on 8/04/2020. (Lester, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S 28 USC 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT issued to Debtor. [Comerica Bank and SCE Federal Credit Union]. (jp)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued [Comerica Bank and SCE Federal Credit Union]. (jp)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Issue Writ of Continuing Garnishment [28 USC section 3205(c)(1)] and ORDER to Issue Clerk's Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment [28 USC section 3202(b)] #7 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that: (1) The Clerk of the Court shall issue a Writ of Continuing Garnishment with respect to Garnishees Comerica Bank and SCE Federal Credit Union; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall issue a Clerk's Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment to Kathy Jo Leydekkers, also known as Kathy Christenson, by signing the forms submitted by the United States. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order, #4 , Writ of Garnishment #5 SERVICE ON GARNISHEE MEGGITT (ORANGE COUNTY), INC. BY CERTIFIED MAIL served on 7/24/2020. (Lester, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment Kathy Jo Leydekkers AS TO GARNISHEES COMERICA BANK AND SCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEES, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Lester, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S 28 USC 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT issued to Debtor. [Meggitt (Orange County), Inc.] (jp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued. [Meggitt (Orange County), Inc.] (jp)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Issue Writ of Continuing Garnishment [28 USC section 3205(c)(1)] and ORDER to Issue Clerk's Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment [28 USC section 3202(b)] #1 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (See document for further information). (jp)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Text Only Entry: This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 8:20-cv-01243-JLS. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (car) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lester, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE MEGGITT (ORANGE COUNTY), INC. [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Lester, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kathy Jo Leydekkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY JO LEYDEKKERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robert Ira Lester
Represented By: Brendan T Mockler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?