Curtis Wheeler et al v. County of Orange et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Wheeler and Cynthia Wheeler
Defendant: Shane L. Sileby, County of Orange, Socorro Villegas and Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01264
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant County of Orange. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney April Marie Mitchell added to party County of Orange(pty:dft)) (Mitchell, April)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File response filed by Defendant County of Orange.(Attorney Michael L Wroniak added to party County of Orange(pty:dft))(Wroniak, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Shane L. Sileby(individually), Shane L. Sileby(in his official capacity as Director, County of Orange-Public Works). (twdb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #5 filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Wheeler, Cynthia Wheeler. (Naghash, Roger)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant County of Orange. (twdb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Shane L. Sileby(individually), Shane L. Sileby(in his official capacity as Director, County of Orange-Public Works). (twdb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Socorro Villegas(individually ), Socorro Villegas(in her official capacity as Officer). (twdb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Supplement #6 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #4 filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Wheeler, Cynthia Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Naghash, Roger)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Supplement #6 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #5 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #4 filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Wheeler, Cynthia Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Naghash, Roger)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 summons, 3 summons, 4 summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so.. (ghap)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Please remove et al from the caption of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27220095 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Wheeler, Curtis Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Attorney Roger E Naghash added to party Curtis Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Roger E Naghash added to party Cynthia Wheeler(pty:pla))(Naghash, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Wheeler et al v. County of Orange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane L. Sileby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Orange
Represented By: Michael L Wroniak
Represented By: April Marie Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socorro Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Wheeler
Represented By: Roger E Naghash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wheeler
Represented By: Roger E Naghash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?