Complete Medical Sales Inc v. Genoray America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.
Defendant: Genoray America, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01277
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Southern Division - Santa Ana Office
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna. The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: (Discovery cut-off 4/6/2021. Motions due by 5/10/2021. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/16/2021. Bench Trial set for 7/27/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna.) The Scheduling Conference set for September 14, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. is VACATED. (mrgo)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR COURT TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 6-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc., Counter Defendant Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc... (Wais, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/8/2020. (lb)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #30 Non-Resident Attorney Michael F. Wais APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant COMPLETE MEDICAL SALES, INC., d/b/a COMPLETE MEDICAL SERVICES, INC., designating Ryan A. Ellis as local counsel. (es)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #31 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan F. Karmo APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Complete Medical Sales, Inc., d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc, designating Ryan A. Ellis as local counsel. (es)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #27 Non-Resident Attorney Walter B. Fisher APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Genoray American, Inc., designating Adam M. Greely as local counsel. (es)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Walter B. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Genoray America, Inc., Counter Claimant Genoray America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27313390) #27 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Greely, Adam)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan F. Karmo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27333024) filed by Plaintiff Complete Medical Sales, Inc. dba Complete Medical Services Inc. Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.. (Ellis, Ryan)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael F. Wais to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27332672) filed by Plaintiff Complete Medical Sales, Inc. dba Complete Medical Services Inc. Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.. (Attorney Ryan Andrew Ellis added to party Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.(pty:pla)) (Ellis, Ryan)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 [IN CHAMBERS] Text Only Entry: Counsel shall file a notice of lodging with a proposed order for the Pro Hac Vice application within 5 days THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Walter B. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Genoray America, Inc., Counter Claimant Genoray America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27313390) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Walter B. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Genoray America, Inc., Counter Claimant Genoray America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27313390) filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainant Genoray America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Greely, Adam)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adam M Greely on behalf of Defendant Genoray America, Inc., Counter Claimant Genoray America, Inc. (Attorney Adam M Greely added to party Genoray America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam M Greely added to party Genoray America, Inc.(pty:cc))(Greely, Adam)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Walter B. Fisher. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan F Karmo. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael F. Wais. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:20-cv-11152-RHC-APP, from Eastern District of Michigan (Port Huron). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 8:20-cv-01277 JVS (DFMx). (esa)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Michigan Eastern
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Central District of California, Southern Division. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent Genoray Co., Ltd. for Genoray America, Inc.. (Fisher, Walter) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation) (Fisher, Walter) Modified on 7/9/2020 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT"] [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.. (Wais, Michael) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING with prejudice Count III of the Plaintiff's Complaint only Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Karmo on behalf of Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.. (Karmo, Jonathan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 7/1/2020 is Cancelled re #6 MOTION to Change Venue . To be decided on the briefs. (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Genoray America, Inc. against Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc. by Genoray America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M) (Fisher, Walter) Modified on 6/17/2020 (DWor). [DOCUMENT IS A COUNTERCLAIM] [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Genoray America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Fisher, Walter) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Genoray America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (Fisher, Walter) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Exclusive Distribution Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Masco Cabinetry, LLC v. Savvy Homes, LLC, 2015 WL 5139418 (E.D. Mich. Sept. 1, 2015)) (Wais, Michael) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 5/27/2020 is Cancelled Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by Genoray America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Fisher, Walter) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc. (Wais, Michael) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Karmo on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Karmo, Jonathan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Wais on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wais, Michael) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, (Fisher, Walter) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Genoray America, Inc. from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2020-1317-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7786039 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Fisher, Walter) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error directed to: Walter B. Fisher re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Complete Medical Sales Inc v. Genoray America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genoray America, Inc.
Represented By: Walter B. Fisher
Represented By: Adam M Greely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complete Medical Sales, Inc. d/b/a Complete Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan F Karmo
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?