Blue Novis, Inc. v. U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blue Novis, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Alternative Payments International
Case Number: 8:2020cv01280
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
2 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Defendant U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.. (Huber, James)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF BLUE NOVIS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO U.S. ALLIANCE GROUP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Plaintiff Blue Novis, Inc.. (Traylor, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant U.S. Alliance Group, Inc., identifying U.S. Alliance Group, Inc., d/b/a Alternative Payments International. (Huber, James)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Defendant U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Request for Judicial Notice)(Huber, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant, U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. d/b/a Alternative Payments International U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant U.S. Alliance Group, Incs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration of James C. Huber in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of James C. Huber, #4 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of James C. Huber) (Attorney James Cannon Huber added to party U.S. Alliance Group, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Huber, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/28/2020. (lb)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01897-JVS-DFM. Case referred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: 8:20-cv-01280-JVS-DFM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (rrp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Notice of Interested Parties, 3 Summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27253893 - Fee: $400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Summons) (Attorney Robert M Traylor added to party Blue Novis, Inc.(pty:pla))(Traylor, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Novis, Inc. v. U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Novis, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M Traylor
Represented By: James Scott Scheper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Alliance Group, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Alternative Payments International
Represented By: James Cannon Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?