James Slatin et al v. Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Martin Knight, John Vinzant, James Slatin and Edna Corley
Defendant: michael george dawe, Prenovost Normandin Dawe & Rocha, A Professional Corporation, Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01285
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #11 filed by Plaintiffs Edna Corley, Martin Knight, James Slatin, John Vinzant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buus, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #11 filed by Plaintiffs Edna Corley, Martin Knight, James Slatin, John Vinzant. (Buus, William)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Michael George Dawe, Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation, (Sohal, Vikram)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #11 filed by Defendants Michael George Dawe, Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sohal, Vikram)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by defendants Michael George Dawe, Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Sohal, Vikram)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Michael George Dawe answer now due 8/28/2020; Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation answer now due 8/28/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants (Attorney Vikram Sohal added to party Michael George Dawe(pty:dft), Attorney Vikram Sohal added to party Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation(pty:dft))(Sohal, Vikram)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Michael George Dawe. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Edna Corley, Martin Knight, James Slatin, John Vinzant. (Buus, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Edna Corley, Martin Knight, James Slatin, John Vinzant. (Buus, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Edna Corley, Martin Knight, James Slatin, John Vinzant, identifying Universal-Products International, LLC; Omega Products International, Inc.; Billon, Inc.. (Buus, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Edna Corley, Martin Knight, James Slatin, John Vinzant. (Buus, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27259402 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs James Slatin, Martin Knight, John Vinzant, Edna Corley. (Attorney William L Buus added to party Edna Corley(pty:pla), Attorney William L Buus added to party Martin Knight(pty:pla), Attorney William L Buus added to party James Slatin(pty:pla), Attorney William L Buus added to party John Vinzant(pty:pla))(Buus, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Slatin et al v. Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Knight
Represented By: William L Buus
Represented By: Eric M Schiffer
Represented By: Lana Joyce Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vinzant
Represented By: William L Buus
Represented By: Eric M Schiffer
Represented By: Lana Joyce Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Slatin
Represented By: William L Buus
Represented By: Eric M Schiffer
Represented By: Lana Joyce Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Corley
Represented By: William L Buus
Represented By: Eric M Schiffer
Represented By: Lana Joyce Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: michael george dawe
Represented By: Janette Sharon Bodenstein
Represented By: Vikram Sohal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prenovost Normandin Dawe & Rocha, A Professional Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prenovost Normandin Dawe and Rocha, A Professional Corporation
Represented By: Janette Sharon Bodenstein
Represented By: Vikram Sohal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?