Ann L. Olver v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Ann L Olver
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 8:2020cv01302
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Eastern District of Arkansas, 4:20-cv-00987 filed 8/20/2020. (iv)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2949, transferring case to USDC, Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to Honorable Kristine G. Baker. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology Inc.(Attorney John Robert Renner added to party Wright Medical Technology Inc(pty:dft))(Renner, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ann L Olver, upon Defendant Wright Medical Technology Inc served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon V. Jones, Receptionist in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Boucher, Raymond)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01302-DOC-ADS. (rrp)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ann L Olver, (Boucher, Raymond)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Wright Medical Technology Inc. (jtil)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ann L Olver. (Boucher, Raymond)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ann L Olver. (Boucher, Raymond)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27278806 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ann L Olver. (Attorney Raymond Paul Boucher added to party Ann L Olver(pty:pla))(Boucher, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ann L. Olver v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: John Robert Renner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann L Olver
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?