Zadro Products, Inc. v. Topnet, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zadro Products, Inc.
Defendant: Topnet, Inc. doing business as Ovente and TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente
Case Number: 8:2020cv01341
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John W Holcomb
2 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: FOURTH STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT TOPNET, INC. D/B/A OVENTES TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge John W. Holcomb #21 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action shall be extended by fourteen (14) days through and including October 29, 2020. SO ORDERED. (yl)
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 Fourth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 29, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mizrahi, Mark)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT TOPNET, INC. D/B/A OVENTES TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #19 by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action shall be extended by seven (7) days through and including October 15, 2020. (yl)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 15, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mizrahi, Mark)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-132) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01341 JWH-DFMx. (rrp)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente answer now due 10/8/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente.(Mizrahi, Mark)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente answer now due 9/22/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente.(Attorney Arash Beral added to party TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente(pty:dft))(Beral, Arash)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc., upon Defendant Topnet, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lin Montante, Executive Assistant, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Kirsch, Kevin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 served on August 3, 2020 and July 27, 2020, respectively. (Kirsch, Kevin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew E. Samuels to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27350176) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Topnet, Inc. (jtil)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew E. Samuels to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27350176) filed by Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Veronica A Reynolds added to party Zadro Products, Inc.(pty:pla)) (Reynolds, Veronica)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Zadro Products, Inc.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc. (Kirsch, Kevin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27347058 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Zadro Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Attorney Kevin W Kirsch added to party Zadro Products, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zadro Products, Inc. v. Topnet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zadro Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin W Kirsch
Represented By: Veronica A Reynolds
Represented By: Andrew E. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topnet, Inc. doing business as Ovente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TopNet, Inc. d/b/a Ovente
Represented By: Mark B Mizrahi
Represented By: Arash Beral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?