James Rutherford v. Allied Tax Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Rutherford
Defendant: Seilabi Acquisition Group II, LLC, Does 1-10, inclusive and Allied Tax Group LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01429
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford.. (Hashemi, Babak)
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Allied Tax Group LLC, Does, Seilabi Acquisition Group II, LLC. (Gladych, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Allied Tax Group, LLC & Seilabi Acquisition Group II, LLC. (Attorney John Anthony Gladych added to party Seilabi Acquisition Group II, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Anthony Gladych added to party Does(pty:dft))(Gladych, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer #17 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. In accordance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the document is accepted as filed. However, counsel must consult the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #19 and file a Notice of Interested Parties no later than **September 14, 2020.** Failure to do so may result in the Answer being STRICKEN. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Allied Tax Group LLC #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1)No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND Allied Tax Group, LLC and Seilabi Acquisition Group II, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Allied Tax Group LLC.(Attorney John Anthony Gladych added to party Allied Tax Group LLC(pty:dft))(Gladych, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, upon Defendant Seilabi Acquisition Group II, LLC served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, upon Defendant Allied Tax Group LLC served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING STATE-LAW CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: For the foregoing reasons, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim, and the claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing in state court. (bm)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff James Rutherfordto Order to Show Cause, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Babak Hashemi, #2 Declaration of Plaintiff)(Hashemi, Babak)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (mku)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. (See document for further information). (jp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Allied Tax Group LLC. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Seilabi Acquisition Group II, LLC. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff James Rutherford, (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Hashemi, Babak)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27482781 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford. (Attorney Babak Hashemi added to party James Rutherford(pty:pla))(Hashemi, Babak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Rutherford v. Allied Tax Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seilabi Acquisition Group II, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Gladych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Represented By: John Anthony Gladych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Tax Group LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Gladych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rutherford
Represented By: Babak Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?