Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Core Optical Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01468
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
2 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
3 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Enzminger, David)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan on behalf of Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. (Padmanabhan, Krishnan)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE JOINT REPORT FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. #15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to the order setting the scheduling conference in this matter (Dkt. #15 ), the Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report (the "Joint Report") shall be filed on or before October 9, 2020. To serve judicial and party efficiency and to expedite review, counsel in this action are ordered to confer with the parties in the following related actions: 8:19-cv-2189-JAK-RAO (Juniper); 8:19-cv-2189-JAK-RAO (Nokia); and 8:20-cv-1463-JAK-RAO (ADVA) in preparing the Joint Report. An identical Joint Report shall be filed in each action no later than October 9, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eth) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/9/2020. (vv)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cisco Systems, Inc. answer now due 9/30/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc..(Attorney David Paul Enzminger added to party Cisco Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Enzminger, David)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02189 JAK(RAOx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01468 JAK(RAOx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cisco Systems Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Hadley, Lawrence)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:20-cv-01468 CJC (JDEx). (esa)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. (et)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, (Hadley, Lawrence)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. NOTICE OF RELATED CASES UNDER LOCAL RULE 83-1.3 Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-02190-JAK-RAO; 8:19-cv-2189-JAK-RAO (Hadley, Lawrence)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27543199 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15) (Attorney Lawrence M Hadley added to party Core Optical Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Hadley, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Core Optical Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence M Hadley
Represented By: Lawrence Robert LaPorte
Represented By: Stephen Eric Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David Paul Enzminger
Represented By: Krishnan Padmanabhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?