Maria D. Ornelas v. Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maria D. Ornelas
Defendant: The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401(k) Plan Committee, Prime Healthcare Services, Inc., The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401 K Plan Committee and Does No. 1-10, whose name are currently unknown
Case Number: 8:2020cv01529
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401 K Plan Committee answer now due 11/5/2020; Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. answer now due 11/5/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401 K Plan Committee; Prime Healthcare Services, Inc..(Attorney Darren E Nadel added to party Prime Healthcare Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Darren E Nadel added to party The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401 K Plan Committee(pty:dft))(Nadel, Darren)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria D. Ornelas, upon Defendant The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401 K Plan Committee served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mae Tang, Account Representative in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tang, Kolin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria D. Ornelas, upon Defendant Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mae Tang, Account Representative in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tang, Kolin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Prime Healthcare Services, Inc., The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401 K Plan Committee. (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria D. Ornelas, (Tang, Kolin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maria D. Ornelas. (Tang, Kolin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria D. Ornelas. (Tang, Kolin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27685500 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Maria D. Ornelas. (Attorney Kolin Tang added to party Maria D. Ornelas(pty:pla))(Tang, Kolin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria D. Ornelas v. Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401(k) Plan Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Darren E Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prime Healthcare Services, Inc. 401 K Plan Committee
Represented By: Darren E Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does No. 1-10, whose name are currently unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D. Ornelas
Represented By: Kolin Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?