Sheree Cosmetics LLC v. Gelivia, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sheree Cosmetics LLC
Defendant: Gelivia, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01536
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant GELIVIA, INC. Gelivia, Inc..(Attorney Eliot F Krieger added to party Gelivia, Inc.(pty:dft))(Krieger, Eliot)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/9/2020. (lb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Gelivia, Inc. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sheree Cosmetics LLC. (Endejan, Judith)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE filed by plaintiff Sheree Cosmetics LLC. Notice of Interested Parties (Endejan, Judith)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Sheree Cosmetics LLC. (Endejan, Judith)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sheree Cosmetics LLC. (Endejan, Judith)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sheree Cosmetics LLC. (Endejan, Judith)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27699296 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Sheree Cosmetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Attorney Judith A Endejan added to party Sheree Cosmetics LLC(pty:pla))(Endejan, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheree Cosmetics LLC v. Gelivia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gelivia, Inc.
Represented By: Eliot F Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheree Cosmetics LLC
Represented By: Judith A Endejan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?