Marvin Vernis Smith v. Marcus Pollard
Petitioner: Marvin Vernis Smith
Respondent: Marcus Pollard
Case Number: 8:2020cv01550
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR EXTENSION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners memorandum is due by or before December 11, 2020. (See Minute Order for further details) granting #5 MOTION for Extension (vm)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum filed by petitioner Marvin Vernis Smith. (vm)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia on behalf of Respondent Marcus Pollard (Attorney Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia added to party Marcus Pollard(pty:res))(Chenelia, Kristen)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: REVIEW OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. It is ORDERED that Petitioner will file a memorandum by or before October 2, 2020, not to exceed 5 pages showing good cause why the case should not be dismissed. (See Minute Order for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (vm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (lh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.(Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Marcus Pollard. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin Vernis Smith v. Marcus Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Vernis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marcus Pollard
Represented By: Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?