John Stanaland et al v. State Farm General Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Stanaland and John Stanaland
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01554
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-6 days, filed by Plaintiffs John Stanaland, Rachel Stanaland.. (Willis, Evan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form, #4 filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Elie, Steven)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by JOHN STANALAND and RACHEL STANALAND John Stanaland, Rachel Stanaland, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #8 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE served on September 2, 2020. (Willis, Evan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:20-cv-01554 JLS (KESx). (lh)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, State Farm General Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs John Stanaland, Rachel Stanaland. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/26/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company, identifying State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Elie, Steven)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Elie, Steven)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01141532 Receipt No: ACACDC-27701155 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer/Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Annual Statement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Claim File) (Attorney Steven J Elie added to party State Farm General Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Elie, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Stanaland et al v. State Farm General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Stanaland
Represented By: John T Richards
Represented By: Evan Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stanaland
Represented By: John T Richards
Represented By: Evan Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven J Elie
Represented By: Juan A Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?