Bernardine King v. Alan N. O'Kain
Plaintiff: Ms. Bernadine C. King and Bernadine C. King
Defendant: Mr. Alan N. OKain
Case Number: 8:2020cv01640
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY in support of APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment #15 filed by Plaintiff Bernadine C. King. (Wallen, Derek)
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Alan N. OKain.(Bhamre, Hema)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Bernadine C. King re: APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment #15 (Goldberg, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Cynthia D. Finerty re APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment #15 filed by Plaintiff Bernadine C. King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Goldberg, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Derek O. Wallen re APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment #15 filed by Plaintiff Bernadine C. King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Goldberg, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by plaintiff Bernadine C. King. Re: APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment #15 (Goldberg, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment filed by plaintiff Bernadine C. King. Application set for hearing on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Writ of Attachment (Form CV-4D), #2 Notice of Application for Writ of Attachment (Form CV-4I), #3 Proposed Order Temporary Protective Order (Form CV-4M), #4 Proposed Order Right to Attach Order (Form CV-4B)) (Goldberg, Andrew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alan N. OKain answer now due 10/9/2020, filed by Defendant Alan N. OKain.(Attorney Hema Christine Bhamre added to party Alan N. OKain(pty:dft))(Bhamre, Hema)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bernadine C. King, upon Defendant Alan N. OKain served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Victoria O'Kain, spouse of Alan O'Kain in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Goldberg, Andrew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Alan N. OKain. (twdb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bernadine C. King. (Goldberg, Andrew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Capobianco counsel for Plaintiff Bernadine C. King. Adding Anthony Capobianco as counsel of record for Bernadine C. King for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bernadine C. King. (Attorney Anthony Capobianco added to party Bernadine C. King(pty:pla))(Capobianco, Anthony)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Derek Owen Wallen on behalf of Plaintiff Bernadine C. King (Attorney Derek Owen Wallen added to party Bernadine C. King(pty:pla))(Wallen, Derek)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bernadine C. King. (Goldberg, Andrew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bernadine C. King, (Goldberg, Andrew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bernadine C. King. (Goldberg, Andrew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27857622 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Bernadine C. King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Andrew Max Goldberg added to party Bernadine C. King(pty:pla))(Goldberg, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernardine King v. Alan N. O'Kain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Alan N. OKain
Represented By: Hema Christine Bhamre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Bernadine C. King
Represented By: Anthony Capobianco
Represented By: Derek Owen Wallen
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine C. King
Represented By: Anthony Capobianco
Represented By: Derek Owen Wallen
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?