Victor Aguirre v. Salvador Morales et al
Plaintiff: VICTOR AGUIRRE
Defendant: SALVADOR MORALES doing business as MARISCOS LOS CORALES, BRIAN NGUYEN and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 8:2020cv01663
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Victor Aguirre pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Brian Nguyen. (Kim, Jason)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACTCLAIM AND RELATED STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claims under the Unruh Act, California's Disabled Persons Act, Californias UCL, and Plaintiff's negligence claim. These claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Plaintiff to assert them in state court. The Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiff's ADA claim. (lc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Victor Aguirre to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #8 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (cw)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACT CLAIM. Plaintiff shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause by September 18, 2020. Failure to respond to this Order may result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act claim. (lc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Salvador Morales, Brian Nguyen. (ghap)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 VICTOR AGUIRRE. (Kim, Jason)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff VICTOR AGUIRRE. (Kim, Jason)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27886202 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party VICTOR AGUIRRE(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victor Aguirre v. Salvador Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVADOR MORALES doing business as MARISCOS LOS CORALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN NGUYEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR AGUIRRE
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?