Lorenzo Dominguez v. Better Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Dominguez
Defendant: Better Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv01784
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2023 Filing 184 Notice filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
March 17, 2023 Filing 183 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
March 16, 2023 Filing 182 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
March 9, 2023 Filing 181 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
March 8, 2023 Filing 180 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
March 7, 2023 Filing 179 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
March 6, 2023 Filing 178 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
March 3, 2023 Filing 177 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
March 2, 2023 Filing 176 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
February 28, 2023 Filing 175 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
February 23, 2023 Filing 174 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
February 22, 2023 Filing 173 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
February 21, 2023 Filing 172 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #103 filed by Better Mortgage Corporation. CCA # 22-55731. Appellee filed a notice of intent to file publicly the answering brief and the supplemental excerpts of record (Docket Entry No. 17). See 9th Cir. R. 27-13(f). Appellants unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. 22) to seal the unredacted answering brief and the supplemental excerpts of record is granted. The Clerk will unseal the notice (Docket Entry No. 17-1) and file publicly the motion to seal(Docket Entry No. 22-1). [See Order for further information]. (car)
February 15, 2023 Filing 170 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
February 13, 2023 Filing 169 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
February 9, 2023 Filing 168 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
February 7, 2023 Filing 167 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
February 6, 2023 Filing 166 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
February 1, 2023 Filing 165 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 27, 2023 Filing 164 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 25, 2023 Filing 163 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 24, 2023 Filing 162 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 23, 2023 Filing 161 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Staying Further Proceedings Pending Outcome of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal #156 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. See document for further information. (jp)
January 19, 2023 Filing 159 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 17, 2023 Filing 158 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 13, 2023 Filing 157 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 11, 2023 Filing 156 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending outcome of appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Susannah)
January 10, 2023 Filing 155 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
January 5, 2023 Filing 154 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
January 3, 2023 Filing 153 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 30, 2022 Filing 152 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 29, 2022 Filing 151 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
December 28, 2022 Filing 150 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 27, 2022 Filing 149 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 22, 2022 Filing 148 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 21, 2022 Filing 147 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 19, 2022 Filing 146 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 16, 2022 Filing 145 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
December 15, 2022 Filing 144 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 14, 2022 Filing 143 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 13, 2022 Filing 142 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 12, 2022 Filing 141 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 9, 2022 Filing 140 Notice filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Brome, Daniel)
December 9, 2022 Filing 139 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 8, 2022 Filing 138 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 7, 2022 Filing 137 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 6, 2022 Filing 136 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
December 5, 2022 Filing 135 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER APPROVING REVISED PROPOSED NOTICE FOR PUTATIVE OPT-INS SUBJECT TO CURATIVE NOTICE (Docs. #130 , #132 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court APPROVES for distribution a version of the Revised Proposed Notice that implements Betters proposed amendments. (jp)
November 15, 2022 Filing 133 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Helland, Matthew)
November 14, 2022 Filing 132 Notice / Revised Notice to Putative Collective Action Members filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Howard, Susannah)
November 8, 2022 Filing 131 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
November 7, 2022 Filing 130 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Distribution of Judicial Notice of Collective Action #99 - Revised Proposed Notice filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Notice)(Brome, Daniel)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Approving Curative Notice (Doc. #127 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file such a revised FLSA Notice for putative opt-ins subject to curative notice within five (5) days of this Order. Defendant shall have five (5) days thereafter to file any objections to the revised proposed Notice. (jp)
October 29, 2022 Filing 128 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporationto Notice (Other), #127 DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CURATIVE NOTICE (Howard, Susannah)
October 28, 2022 Filing 127 Notice OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING CURATIVE NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For an Order Approving Curative Notice)(Helland, Matthew)
October 27, 2022 Filing 126 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Distribution of Judicial Notice of Collective Action (Doc. #99 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (See document for further information). (jp)
October 19, 2022 Filing 124 Notice / Joint Notice Regarding Correspondence to Former Employees Regarding Severance Agreements filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Karr, Adam)
October 19, 2022 Filing 123 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
October 14, 2022 Filing 122 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Distribution of Judicial Notice of Collective Action #99 filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Brome, Daniel)
October 14, 2022 Filing 121 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
October 7, 2022 Filing 120 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Distribution of Judicial Notice of Collective Action #99 / Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Issue Judicial Notice of Collective Action filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susannah K. Howard in Support of Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Issue Judicial Notice of Collective Action, #2 Declaration of Joel Graber in Support of Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Issue Judicial Notice of Collective Action)(Howard, Susannah)
September 15, 2022 Filing 119 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
September 6, 2022 Filing 118 Notice TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION FORM filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Karr, Adam)
September 6, 2022 Filing 117 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
September 6, 2022 Filing 116 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings March 25, 2022 re Transcript #115 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Elias, Laura) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 6, 2022 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on March 25, 2022. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2022. (Elias, Laura)
September 2, 2022 Filing 114 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
August 29, 2022 Filing 113 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
August 24, 2022 Filing 112 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation's Ex Parte Application for a Stay of the Court's July 21, 2022 and May 17, 2022 Order (Dkt. Nos. #91 and #102 ) Pending Appeal or, in the Alternative, Pending Application to The Court of Appeals for a Stay Pending Appeal (Doc. #106 ). See document for further information. (jp)
August 16, 2022 Filing 110 Notice of Filing Consents filed by plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent, #2 Consent)(Helland, Matthew)
August 4, 2022 Filing 109 STATEMENT /Joint Statement Regarding Court Approved Curative Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Howard, Susannah)
August 4, 2022 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's ex parte Application to Stay Re: Notice (Other),, #106 (Brome, Daniel)
August 4, 2022 Filing 107 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
August 3, 2022 Filing 106 Notice OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OF THE COURTS JULY 21, 2022 AND MAY 17, 2022 ORDERS (DKT. NOS. 91 & 102) PENDING APPEAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PENDING APPLICATION TO THE COURT OF APPEALS FOR A STAY PENDING APPEAL filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT BETTER MORTGAGE CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OF THE COURTS COURTS JULY 21, 2022 AND MAY 17, 2022 ORDERS (DKT. NOS. 91 & 102) PENDING APPEAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PENDING APPLICATION TO THE COURT OF APPEALS FOR A STAY PENDING APPEAL)(Karr, Adam)
August 3, 2022 Filing 105 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55731 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #103 as to Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (jp)
August 3, 2022 Filing 104 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
August 1, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. Appeal of Order,,,, #102 , Order on Motion for Relief,, #91 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33732747.) (Karr, Adam)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' NOTICE OF DISPUTES REGARDING COURT-APPROVED CURATIVE NOTICE #93 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court ORDERS the parties to provide an updated proposed curative notice in line with the Courts rulings above within fourteen 14 (days) of this Orders issuance. To the extent there are disputes regarding any language, the parties shall include in the same proposed curative notice, their versions of proposed language for a particular section. The parties shall email the Courtroom Deputy with a Word version of the proposed curative notice. The parties may also include any supplemental briefing necessary to explain any additional concerns. Upon the parties filing, the Court will take the matter under submission and make its ruling on the final language for the curative notice. The Court further advises the parties that if any party proposes a notice that clearly conflict with the multiple orders the Court has now issued, the Court may award attorneys fees to the other side. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 18, 2022 Filing 101 Notice of Consent Filing filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
July 8, 2022 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Distribution of Judicial Notice of Collective Action #99 filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Helland, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Declaration, #19 Declaration, #20 Declaration, #21 Declaration, #22 Declaration, #23 Declaration, #24 Declaration, #25 Declaration, #26 Declaration, #27 Declaration)(Helland, Matthew)
July 8, 2022 Filing 99 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Distribution of Judicial Notice of Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Helland, Matthew)
July 6, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by PLAINTIFF Lorenzo Dominguez. (Hilbert, Bethany)
July 1, 2022 Filing 97 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
June 29, 2022 Filing 96 NOTICE filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Howard, Susannah)
June 29, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83-1.4.1 (Howard, Susannah)
June 29, 2022 Filing 94 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Helland, Matthew)
May 31, 2022 Filing 93 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. Parties' Joint Notice of Disputes Regarding Court-Approved Curative Notice regarding Order on Motion for Relief,, #91 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3)(Brome, Daniel)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING (1) Motion to Deny Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 (Doc. #53 ) and (2) Motion to Deny Conditional Certification Under Fair Labor Standards Act (Doc. #54 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (See document for further information). (jp)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING in Part Motion to Invalidate Uncounselled Releases and Waiver Agreement Obtained Ex Parte and for Corrective Notice (Doc. #52 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer to decide on appropriate language for the curative notice, which the parties must submit to the Court for approval within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Defendant is ORDERED to communicate with putative class members regarding the subject matter of this litigation only in writing and with Court approval. For the above reasons, Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (See document for further information). (jp)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File #82 . NO SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE. (jp)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Defendant Leave to File Sur-Reply #77 . (See document for further information). (jp)
April 21, 2022 Filing 88 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for Friday, April 22, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will issue a separate Scheduling Order pursuant to the parties' Joint 26(f) Report. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (droj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2022 Filing 87 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan / SECOND REVISED JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT AND EXHIBIT A ; estimated length of trial 1 week, filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Howard, Susannah)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED insofar as the documents to be filed under seal reflect the redactions and documents identified in the Declaration of Susannah K. Howard (Doc. 75). (see document for further details). granting in part #68 APPLICATION to Seal Document(s). (hr)
March 29, 2022 Filing 85 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Nonargument Notice of Additional Authority #82 filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Helland, Matthew)
March 29, 2022 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation for Court Reporter. Court will contact Maggie Vuong at mvuong@omm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Howard, Susannah)
March 28, 2022 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez for Court Reporter. Court will contact Bethany Hilbert at bhilbert@headlawfirm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hilbert, Bethany)
March 28, 2022 Filing 82 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Nonargument Notice of Additional Authority filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susannah K. Howard, #2 Proposed Order) (Howard, Susannah)
March 25, 2022 Filing 81 MINUTES OF Hearings on Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Uncounseled Releases and Waiver Agreements Obtained Ex Parte #52 , Defendant's Motion to Deny Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 #53 , and Defendant's Motion to Deny Conditional Certification Under Fair Labor Standards Act #54 held before Judge Josephine L. Staton: Motion hearings held on Zoom. The Court hears oral argument from the parties. The Court takes the Motion under submission. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Matthew Helland, Bethany Hilbert, Charles Head, Daniel Brome; Attorneys for Defendant: Susannah Howard; Andrew Karr. Courtroom Deputy: Melissa Kunig; Time in Court: 0:30. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (mku)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Defendant Bertter Mortgage Corporation's Application for an Order Granting Leave to File Documents Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.6.2 (Doc. #71 ). (See document for further information). (jp)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Allow Untimely Filing Due to Technical Failures (Doc. #70 ). (See document for further information). (jp)
March 22, 2022 Filing 78 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Surreply and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply Evidence #77 filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of C. Andrew Head)(Head, Charles)
March 21, 2022 Filing 77 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Surreply and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply Evidence filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susannah K. Howard in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Howard, Susannah)
March 18, 2022 Filing 76 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Reply Brief ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Invalidate Uncounseled Releases; Second Declaration of C. Andy Head; and Exhibits 4, 5, 14, 15, 16, 17, 20, 21, 23, 26, 28, 33, 34, 38, 41, 42, 48, 50, 51, 52, 53, 5 #68 filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation.(Howard, Susannah)
March 18, 2022 Filing 75 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Reply Brief ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Invalidate Uncounseled Releases; Second Declaration of C. Andy Head; and Exhibits 4, 5, 14, 15, 16, 17, 20, 21, 23, 26, 28, 33, 34, 38, 41, 42, 48, 50, 51, 52, 53, 5 #68 filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation.(Howard, Susannah)
March 14, 2022 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Susannah K. Howard re Reply (Motion related) #73 , Reply (Motion related) #72 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION DENY CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Howard, Susannah)
March 14, 2022 Filing 73 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deny Conditional Certification Under Fair Labor Standards Act #54 filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Howard, Susannah)
March 14, 2022 Filing 72 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deny Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 #53 filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Howard, Susannah)
March 14, 2022 Filing 71 APPLICATION for Leave to file Defendant's Reply ISO Motion to Deny Class Certification and Defendant's Reply ISO Motion to Deny Conditional Certification filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shara Evaskovich ISO Application for Leave, #2 Declaration of Rick Kings ISO Application for Leave, #3 Proposed Order) (Howard, Susannah)
March 14, 2022 Filing 70 APPLICATION for Leave to file the untimely filing of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Invalidate Uncounseled Release Agreements and Waivers filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danie S. Brome, #2 Proposed Order) (Brome, Daniel)
March 14, 2022 Filing 69 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Reply Brief ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Invalidate Uncounseled Releases; Second Declaration of C. Andy Head; and Exhibits 4, 5, 14, 15, 16, 17, 20, 21, 23, 26, 28, 33, 34, 38, 41, 42, 48, 50, 51, 52, 53, 5 #68 filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibits)(Brome, Daniel)
March 14, 2022 Filing 68 APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Reply Brief ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Invalidate Uncounseled Releases; Second Declaration of C. Andy Head; and Exhibits 4, 5, 14, 15, 16, 17, 20, 21, 23, 26, 28, 33, 34, 38, 41, 42, 48, 50, 51, 52, 53, 59, 60, 61, 74, 80, 82, 83, 85, 87, 94, 95, 96, and 97 under seal filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Exhibit 1-32, #5 Exhibit 33-66, #6 Exhibit 67-97, #7 Declaration)(Brome, Daniel)
March 7, 2022 Filing 67 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Josephine L. Staton - Effective Monday, March 21, 2022, Judge Josephine L. Staton will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 8A, on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8A of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. For additional information regarding mandatory chambers copies and the use of Zoom hearings in civil matters, please refer to Judge Staton's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-josephine-l-staton. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 11, 2022 Filing 66 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Uncounseled Releases and Waiver Agreements Obtained Ex Parte #52 filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenna Meyerhoff, #2 Declaration of Susannah K. Howard)(Howard, Susannah)
February 11, 2022 Filing 65 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deny Conditional Certification Under Fair Labor Standards Act #54 filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Brome, Daniel)
February 11, 2022 Filing 64 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deny Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 #53 filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Brome, Daniel)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott re Stipulation for Protective Order #62 . [See order for details.] (es)
January 21, 2022 Filing 62 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation.(Howard, Susannah)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Doc. #60 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court hereby ORDERS the following briefing schedule for the motions filed at Dockets 52, 53 and 54: 1. Oppositions shall be filed no later than February 11, 2022; and 2. Replies shall be filed no later than March 11, 2022. (lom)
December 8, 2021 Filing 60 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion and Reply to Motion filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Helland, Matthew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court has received and reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Doc. 58.) In light of the information contained therein and the pending motions, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 10/29/2021 is CONTINUED to 4/22/2022 at 10:30 AM. The parties shall file a revised Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than 4/15/2022. re: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #58 . (jp)
October 19, 2021 Filing 58 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Revised Joint Rule 26(f) Report) filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation.. (Howard, Susannah)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCEAND ORDERING COUNSEL TO REVIEW LOCAL PROCEDURES by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference attached a blank Exhibit A. (Doc. #51 at 7.) The Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by the parties did not include the completed Exhibit A. (Doc. #56 .) Accordingly, no later than 10/19/2021, counsel shall fi le an Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report with a fully completed Exhibit A. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to 10/29/2021, at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
October 1, 2021 Filing 56 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation.. (Howard, Susannah)
October 1, 2021 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Kenna Meyerhoff in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deny Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 #53 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deny Conditional Certification Under Fair Labor Standards Act #54 filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Howard, Susannah)
October 1, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deny Conditional Certification Under Fair Labor Standards Act filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Howard, Susannah)
October 1, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deny Class Certification Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Howard, Susannah)
October 1, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Uncounseled Releases and Waiver Agreements Obtained Ex Parte filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Invalidate Releases, #2 Declaration of C. Andrew Head, #3 Exhibit 1 to Head Declaration, #4 Declaration of Rudy Chaidez, #5 Proposed Order) (Brome, Daniel)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 10:30 am. See Order for details. (mku)
August 24, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #49 (Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation.(Karr, Adam)
August 3, 2021 Filing 49 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #44 , filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez (Attachments: #1 A - Consent Form, #2 B - PAGA Letter, #3 C - Notice of Filing Fee)(Helland, Matthew)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation for Leave to File Second Amended Class and Collective Action Complaint (Doc. #47 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that (1) The Court grants leave for Plaintiff to file the Second Amended Complaint, as reflected at Exhibit 2 to the Parties' Stipulation. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry within 7 days of the entry of this order. (2) Defendant shall have 21 days from the day on which the Second Amended Complaint is filed to file a responsive pleading. (jp)
July 29, 2021 Filing 47 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to File Second Amended Class and Collective Action Complaint for Damages, Restitution, Penalties, and Injunctive Relief filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redline Version of Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Clean Version of Second Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Brome, Daniel)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Re: Joint Stipulation to Continue Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation's Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint #45 by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follow: (1) Defendant shall have an additional seven (7) days to respond to the FAC, until 7/29/2021; (2) Until that time, the Parties shall continue to meet and confer regarding the adequacy of the allegations set forth in the FAC. (jp)
July 21, 2021 Filing 45 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation's Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint from July 22, 2021 to July 29, 2021 filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susannah Howard, #2 Proposed Order)(Howard, Susannah)
July 8, 2021 Filing 44 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - PAGA Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Fee)(Helland, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Change of address by Jason Christopher Marsili attorney for Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. Changing attorneys address to 11150 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 990; Los Angeles, CA 90064. Filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Marsili, Jason)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Set Aside Default #18 (Doc. #34 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion. Defendant shall file an answer or other response under Rule 12 of the FRCP to Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez's complaint no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. (jp)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follow: The stay of this action is hereby lifted. (See document for further information). (jp)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Adam J Karr, Susannah Kelly Howard for Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation in place and stead of Attorneys Barbara I Antonucci and Steven B Katz #39 . (jp)
June 23, 2021 Filing 39 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Susannah K. Howard in place of attorney Barbara I. Antonucci filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Antonucci, Barbara)
June 16, 2021 Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Tolling filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Helland, Matthew)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDERTO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Stipulation to Continue #35 , for the following reasons: (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; (2) Counsel shall consult Judge Staton's Procedures and Schedules Page; Proposed Order should be filed as an attachment to the efiled application and emailed as a Word document to Judge Josephine L. Staton generic email addresses (JLS_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov). (jp)
June 7, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. (2) Proposed Order shall be filed as separate attachment to the e-filed "NOTICE OF LODGING" and e-mailed to a Judge Staton generic email addresses a Microsoft Word version of the document In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
June 1, 2021 Filing 35 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 6/8/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #37 ] - Joint STIPULATION to Continue Tolling filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez.(Helland, Matthew) Modified on 6/8/2021 (jp).
April 8, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #18 . filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Bauer in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Karr, Adam)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) LIFTING STAY AND (2) SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE STIPULATION OR MOTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court (1) LIFTS THE STAY in this action, and (2) ORDERS that the parties shall have until 4/19/2021 to either (a) file a stipulation of dismissal or (b) file a stipulation or motion to set aside the default of Defendant, which was entered on 10/27/2020 (Doc. #18 ). (See document for further information). (jp)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Stipulation to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Mediation #31 . (See document for further information). (jp)
February 26, 2021 Filing 31 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Karr, Adam)
February 26, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Susannah Kelly Howard on behalf of Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation (Attorney Susannah Kelly Howard added to party Better Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft))(Howard, Susannah)
February 26, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adam J Karr on behalf of Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation (Attorney Adam J Karr added to party Better Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft))(Karr, Adam)
December 29, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou)
December 22, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation (Killens, Christopher)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On November 17, 2020, the Court issued an Order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution #22 . On December 8, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Response to the Courts Order #25 . In light of this responsive filing as well as the Courts Order Staying this action through February 28, 2021, the Court hereby orders the OSC discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez to Order to Show Cause (Helland, Matthew)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation to Stay Case #23 (bm)
November 18, 2020 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Stay)(Katz, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's, to show cause in writing no later than 12/8/2020, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp)
October 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation, identifying Better HoldCo, Inc.. (Katz, Steven)
October 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven B Katz on behalf of Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation (Attorney Steven B Katz added to party Better Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft))(Katz, Steven)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Barbara I Antonucci on behalf of Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation (Attorney Barbara I Antonucci added to party Better Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft))(Antonucci, Barbara)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (jp)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Helland, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order) (Helland, Matthew)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff's counsel, to show cause in writing no later than 10/26/2020, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez, upon Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Cayetano - Service of Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Helland, Matthew)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Bethany A Hilbert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez, designating Jason C Marsili as local counsel. (jp)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Charles A Head APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez, designating Jason C Marsili as local counsel. (jp)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bethany A. Hilbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28212665) filed by PLAINTIFF Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application on Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Marsili, Jason)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles A. Head to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28212519) filed by PLAINTIFF Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application on Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Marsili, Jason)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bethany Hilbert on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney C Andrew Head on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Better Mortgage Corporation. (ghap)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez, identifying Members of the putative collective who consent to join the action as opt-in plaintiffs. (Helland, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Helland, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Helland, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28151651 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lorenzo Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form) (Attorney Matthew C Helland added to party Lorenzo Dominguez(pty:pla))(Helland, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorenzo Dominguez v. Better Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Dominguez
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Represented By: Charles A. Head
Represented By: Bethany A. Hilbert
Represented By: Jason Christopher Marsili
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Barbara I Antonucci
Represented By: Steven B Katz
Represented By: Christopher A Killens
Represented By: Susannah Kelly Howard
Represented By: Adam J Karr
Represented By: Allan W. Gustin
Represented By: Adam J. Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?