Kim Perez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kim Perez and EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant: Quicken Loans, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01831
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Levy counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Christopher Levy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Levy, Christopher)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine A Neben on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attorney Katherine A Neben added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Neben, Katherine)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #10 . Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC answer due 11/30/2020. (twdb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 30, 2020 filed by Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bhasker, Shalini)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on December 3, 2020. (cw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Levy, Christopher)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kim Perez answer now due 10/28/2020, filed by Defendant, Quicken Loans Quicken Loans, LLC.(Attorney Shalini Bhasker added to party Quicken Loans, LLC(pty:dft))(Bhasker, Shalini)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
September 23, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kim Perez in Orange County Superior Court on 8/19/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Levy, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Levy, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Levy, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01155866-CL-NP-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28206375 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint (State Court), #2 Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet (State Court), #3 Exhibit C - Summons (State Court), #4 Exhibit D - Civil Filing Fee Receipt (State Court), #5 Exhibit E - Quicken Loan's Joinder and Consent to Removal) (Attorney Christopher Levy added to party EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.(pty:dft))(Levy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim Perez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Perez
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, LLC
Represented By: Shalini Bhasker
Represented By: Justin M Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?