Frank Bellospirito v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Frank Bellospirito
Defendant: Department of Justice, Andrew Thomas Pribe, Bruce R Ellisen and Gretchen M Wolfinger
Case Number: 8:2020cv01855
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS #6 by Judge James V. Selna. The stipulation is entered and the case is dismissed without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Department of Justice, Bruce R Ellisen, Andrew Thomas Pribe, Gretchen M Wolfinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Dismiss)(Conte, Robert)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:16-cv-00473 JVS (KESx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01855 JVS (KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna. (rrp)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
September 25, 2020 COMPLAINT against Defendants Department of Justice, Bruce R Ellisen, Andrew Thomas Pribe, Gretchen M Wolfinger, filed by Plaintiff Frank Bellospirito. Filed in State Court on 6/17/2020 Submitted with Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Department of Justice, Bruce R Ellisen, Andrew Thomas Pribe, Gretchen M Wolfinger. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-00351-JVS-KES (Conte, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Department of Justice, Bruce R Ellisen, Andrew Thomas Pribe, Gretchen M Wolfinger. (Conte, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01145730 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant Andrew Thomas Pribe, Gretchen M Wolfinger, Department of Justice, Bruce R Ellisen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint) (Attorney Robert F Conte added to party Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Robert F Conte added to party Bruce R Ellisen(pty:dft), Attorney Robert F Conte added to party Andrew Thomas Pribe(pty:dft), Attorney Robert F Conte added to party Gretchen M Wolfinger(pty:dft))(Conte, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Bellospirito v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Bellospirito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Thomas Pribe
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce R Ellisen
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen M Wolfinger
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?