Patricia Ann Doyle v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Doyle
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 8:2020cv01917
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Anthony J. Peraica. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Illinois Northern
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California the electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Defendant's Motion for a Change of Venue or Dismissal #9 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted as to the request for change of venue given Plaintiff's agreement that pursuant to 42 U.S.C. section 405(g), the case should be transferred to the Central District of California, where she now resides. (Doc. 11). The motion for dismissal is denied. The case is hereby transferred to the Central District of California, Southern Division, forthwith. Mailed notice (sxw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Patricia Ann Doyle to MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul to change venue #9 (Peraica, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue or Dismissal #9 is due 10/1/2020. Defendant's reply is due 10/8/2020.Mailed notice (sxw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul to change venue (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review is due within 60 days of the filing of the administrative record (no motion required). The Social Security Administration's motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support are due 45 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after defendant's brief is filed. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice (sxw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 73.1. Parties have consented to the reassignment. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/13/20.(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The parties filed a joint consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, this case will be reassigned. Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Susan Willoughby Anderson as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Saul (Anderson, Susan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to Local Rule 4(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(a)(2), the defendant is to file its answer and administrative record no later than 9/30/20. Plaintiff's opening brief is due 10/28/20. Defendant's response brief is due 11/25/20. Plaintiff's reply brief is due 12/9/20. Ruling by mail. Counsel should note that these dates modify the briefing schedule set forth in Local Rule 16.4. Counsel are further directed to meet and confer prior to the date the answer and administrative record are filed to determine whether: (a) the parties will agree to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and (b) an agreed remand order is necessary. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, the appropriate form to execute and file with the court may be found at the following location: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/PUBLIC/Forms/consent.pdf. Telephone Conference set for 8/27/20 at 9:00 a.m. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. The Court orders the parties to file a joint written status report by 8/21/20. The report, which shall be as concise as possible, shall set forth: (1) the current deadlines imposed by the Court and whether the matter has been referred to the Magistrate Judge in any fashion (e.g., for discovery supervision; for resolution of a motion; for settlement; etc.); (2) the progress of discovery, if discovery is ongoing; (3) the status of briefing on unresolved motions, if any; (4) whether the parties have engaged or are engaging in settlement discussions and the status of those discussions; (5) for cases without any future court dates, an agreed proposed schedule; (6) for cases that have future court dates and if the parties believe there is good cause to extend the current deadlines, a proposed amended schedule and the basis for the request; (7) a request for any agreed action that the Court can take without a hearing; (8) and whether the parties believe a telephonic hearing or in-person hearing is necessary within the next 60 days, and, if so, the issue(s) that warrants discussion and the parties' respective positions.Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
July 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Administrative Review filed by Patricia Ann Doyle; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17272522. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attorney Appearance)(Peraica, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (pj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Ann Doyle v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Doyle
Represented By: Anthony J. Peraica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Susan Willoughby Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?