Clifford Rosen et al v. Urban Commons, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald A Christensen and Clifford A Rosen
Defendant: Urban Commons, LLC, Howard Wu, Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, Digital Capital Markets, LLC, Urban Commons Battery Park, LLC, Taylor Woods, C. Brian Egnatz, Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC d/b/a LittleRiver Capital, LLC, Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Littleriver Capital, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01973
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC, (Meyer, Derek)
December 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case against Defendant Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC filed by Defendant Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/22/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Meyer, Derek)
December 9, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants C. Brian Egnatz, Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, Urban Commons Battery Park, LLC, Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu, identifying John Michael Dannelley, Mary A. Dannelley, Andrew Murray. (Marks, Paul)
December 9, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer #17 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. In accordance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the document is accepted as filed. However, counsel must consult the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #18 and file a Notice of Interested Parties no later than **December 14, 2020.** Failure to do so may result in the Answer being STRICKEN. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
December 7, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant C. Brian Egnatz, Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, Urban Commons Battery Park, LLC, Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu.(Attorney Paul S Marks added to party C. Brian Egnatz(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Marks added to party Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Marks added to party Urban Commons Battery Park, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Marks added to party Urban Commons, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Marks added to party Taylor Woods(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Marks added to party Howard Wu(pty:dft))(Marks, Paul)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC answer now due 12/11/2020, filed by Defendant Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC.(Meyer, Derek)
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Derek J Meyer counsel for Defendant Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC. Adding Derek J. Meyer as counsel of record for CHICAGO ANALYTIC TRADING COMPANY, LLC d/b/a LITTLE RIVER CAPITAL, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CHICAGO ANALYTIC TRADING COMPANY, LLC d/b/a LITTLE RIVER CAPITAL, LLC. (Attorney Derek J Meyer added to party Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Meyer, Derek)
November 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Clifford A Rosen pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Digital Capital Markets, LLC. (Lopez, Hugo)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald A Christensen, upon Defendant Digital Capital Markets, LLC served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gary Barnett, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blank, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald A Christensen, upon Defendant Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blank, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald A Christensen, upon Defendant Urban Commons Battery Park, LLC served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blank, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald A Christensen, upon Defendant Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blank, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald A Christensen, upon Defendant C. Brian Egnatz served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Frankie Doe, Doorman at Residence in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Blank, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC, Digital Capital Markets, LLC, C. Brian Egnatz, Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, Urban Commons Battery Park, LLC, Urban Commons, LLC, Taylor Woods, Howard Wu. (esa)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Clifford A Rosen. (Lopez, Hugo)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Clifford A Rosen. (Lopez, Hugo)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Interested Parties (Attorney Hugo Armando Lopez added to party Ronald A Christensen(pty:pla))(Lopez, Hugo)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28503195 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Clifford A Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint) (Attorney Hugo Armando Lopez added to party Clifford A Rosen(pty:pla))(Lopez, Hugo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford Rosen et al v. Urban Commons, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Commons, LLC
Represented By: Yuriko M Shikai
Represented By: Todd Nielsen
Represented By: Paul S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Wu
Represented By: Yuriko M Shikai
Represented By: Todd Nielsen
Represented By: Paul S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC
Represented By: Yuriko M Shikai
Represented By: Todd Nielsen
Represented By: Paul S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Commons Battery Park, LLC
Represented By: Yuriko M Shikai
Represented By: Todd Nielsen
Represented By: Paul S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Woods
Represented By: Yuriko M Shikai
Represented By: Todd Nielsen
Represented By: Paul S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Brian Egnatz
Represented By: Paul S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC d/b/a LittleRiver Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Analytic Trading Company, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Littleriver Capital, LLC
Represented By: Derek J. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald A Christensen
Represented By: Hugo Armando Lopez
Represented By: Norma V. Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford A Rosen
Represented By: Hugo Armando Lopez
Represented By: Norma V. Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?