Gene Moran v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. gene moran and Gene Moran
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02043
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT Office Depot, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to complaint)(Okorocha, Okorie)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Office Depot, Inc. answer now due 1/11/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Office Depot, Inc..(Yang, Yi)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yi Yang counsel for Defendant Office Depot, Inc.. Adding Eva Yi Yang as counsel of record for Office Depot, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Office Depot, Inc.. (Attorney Yi Yang added to party Office Depot, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yang, Yi)
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Office Depot, Inc. (jp)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran. (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is directed to the incorrect defendant name on the "TO:" field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran. (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff gene moran, (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28685573 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Okorie Okorocha added to party gene moran(pty:pla))(Okorocha, Okorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gene Moran v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. gene moran
Represented By: Okorie Okorocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Moran
Represented By: Okorie Okorocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Yi Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?