32nd District Agricultural Association, a California State Institution et al
Plaintiff: 32nd District Agricultural Association, a California State Institution and 32nd District Agricultural Association
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Ovations Fanfare, L.P. a Pennsylvania Limited Partnership doing business as Spectra Food Service and Hospitality, an entity of unknown form
Petitioner: Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality
Counter Claimant: Ovations Fanfare, L.P.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02049
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM (DKT. #16 ) by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the last day for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants counterclaims shall be extended from December 10, 2020 to January 8,2021 (et)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #10 filed by Plaintiff 32nd District Agricultural Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaim)(Sunseri, Stephen)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on January 14, 2021. (cw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #10 as to Counter Defendant 32nd District Agricultural Association. (twdb)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #10 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Ovations Fanfare, L.P.. (Williams, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please add after Summons in a civil action as to the Counterclaims. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #10 filed by Counterclaimant Ovations Fanfare, L.P.. (Williams, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), , COUNTERCLAIM against 32nd District Agricultural Association filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Ovations Fanfare, L.P..(Williams, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ovations Fanfare, L.P. answer now due 11/13/2020, Ovations Fanfare, L.P..(Williams, Michael)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ovations Fanfare, L.P.. (Williams, Michael)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 served on October 26, 2020. (Williams, Michael)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Roy Williams counsel for Movant Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality. Adding Michael R. Williams as counsel of record for Defendant Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Michael R. Williams. (Attorney Michael Roy Williams added to party Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality(pty:bkmov))(Williams, Michael)
October 23, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ovations Fanfare, L.P. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff 32nd District Agricultural Association. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/23/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality (Bienert, Thomas)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2020- 01161661-CU-CO-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28688690 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality. (Attorney Thomas H Bienert, Jr added to party Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality(pty:bkmov))(Bienert, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 32nd District Agricultural Association, a California State Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 32nd District Agricultural Association, a California State Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 32nd District Agricultural Association
Represented By: Joshua Meir Caplan
Represented By: Stephen A Sunseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ovations Fanfare, L.P., d/b/a Spectra Food Service and Hospitality
Represented By: Thomas H Bienert, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovations Fanfare, L.P. a Pennsylvania Limited Partnership doing business as Spectra Food Service and Hospitality, an entity of unknown form
Represented By: Thomas H Bienert, Jr
Represented By: Michael Roy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ovations Fanfare, L.P.
Represented By: Thomas H Bienert, Jr
Represented By: Michael Roy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?