Suneeta Persaud v. Optum Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Suneeta Persaud
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc. and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv02103
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sharde Thomas Skahan counsel for Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. Adding Sharde T. Skahan as counsel of record for Optum Services, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Attorney Sharde Thomas Skahan added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Skahan, Sharde)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Anderson Wahlander on behalf of Defendant Optum Services, Inc. (Attorney Michael Anderson Wahlander added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wahlander, Michael)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation to Submit All Claims to Arbitration and Stay Action (Dkt. #10 ). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Arbitration filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winters, Mason)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Winters, Mason)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on January 7, 2021. (cw)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
October 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/29/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2)(ghap)
October 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Optum Services, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Suneeta Persaud. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Mason R. Winters re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Winters, Mason)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Susan A. Weedman re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Winters, Mason)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc., identifying Optum Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Winters, Mason)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Winters, Mason)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01158083-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28791662 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint and related documents, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Mason R Winters added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Winters, Mason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suneeta Persaud v. Optum Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mason R Winters
Represented By: Michael Anderson Wahlander
Represented By: Sharde Thomas Skahan
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Brophy
Represented By: Andrew Marc Paley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suneeta Persaud
Represented By: Justin Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?