Ruth Manzo v. Anaheim Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Manzo
Defendant: Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Bonnie Lam, Rachel Henry, Lola Harman and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv02110
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Bradley M. Berg on behalf of Plaintiff Ruth Manzo. Filed by Plaintiff Ruth Manzo (Attorney Bradley Michael Berg added to party Ruth Manzo(pty:pla))(Berg, Bradley)
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Brett J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff Ruth Manzo. Filed by Plaintiff Ruth Manzo (Attorney Brett J Williamson added to party Ruth Manzo(pty:pla))(Williamson, Brett)
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) #14 filed by Defendants Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Lola Harman, Rachel Henry, Bonnie Lam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J)(Johnson, Moses)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint) filed by Defendants Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Lola Harman, Rachel Henry, Bonnie Lam. Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Moses)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE filed by Defendants Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Lola Harman, Rachel Henry, Bonnie Lam. re Taking Motion to Dismiss Complaint Off Calendar (12/21/20) (Johnson, Moses)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge James V. Selna: On December 1, 2020, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint. The Court therefore VACATES the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for December 21, 2020, as MOOT. (es)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Plaintiffs amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Ruth Manzo(Anaebere-Nicholson, Ugochi)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Moses)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(Johnson, Moses)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Lola Harman, Rachel Henry, Bonnie Lam. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Johnson, Moses)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/19/2021. (lb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
November 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT/PETITION against defendants Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Does, Lola Harman, Rachel Henry, Bonnie Lam, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ruth Manzo. (filed in state court 10/19/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Lola Harman, Rachel Henry, Bonnie Lam. (Johnson, Moses)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Lola Harman, Rachel Henry, Bonnie Lam, identifying Anaheim Housing Authority, Kerrin Cardwell, Rachel Henry, Lola Harman, Bonnie Lam. (Johnson, Moses)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01166257 Receipt No: ACACDC-28816222 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Kerrin Cardwell, Lola Harman, Rachel Henry, Anaheim Housing Authority, Bonnie Lam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Moses W Johnson, IV added to party Anaheim Housing Authority(pty:dft), Attorney Moses W Johnson, IV added to party Kerrin Cardwell(pty:dft), Attorney Moses W Johnson, IV added to party Lola Harman(pty:dft), Attorney Moses W Johnson, IV added to party Rachel Henry(pty:dft), Attorney Moses W Johnson, IV added to party Bonnie Lam(pty:dft))(Johnson, Moses)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruth Manzo v. Anaheim Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anaheim Housing Authority
Represented By: Moses W Johnson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerrin Cardwell
Represented By: Moses W Johnson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Lam
Represented By: Moses W Johnson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Henry
Represented By: Moses W Johnson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lola Harman
Represented By: Moses W Johnson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Manzo
Represented By: Ugochi Lynne Anaebere-Nicholson
Represented By: Kenneth W Babcock
Represented By: Bradley Michael Berg
Represented By: Brett J Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?