Eric Miller v. Accurate Background, LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Miller
Defendant: Accurate Background, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02343
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Lauren KW Brennan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eric Miller Plaintiff, designating Stephanie R. Tatar as local counsel. (twdb)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Megan Poitevint Mitchell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Accurate Background LLC, Defendant, designating David G. Hagopian as local counsel. Granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Megan Poitevint Mitchell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Accurate Background LLC, Defendant, designating David G. Hagopian as local counsel. (twdb)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Henry M. Perlowski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Accurate Background LLC, Defendant, designating David G. Hagopian as local counsel. Granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Henry M. Perlowski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Accurate Background LLC, Defendant, designating David G. Hagopian as local counsel. (twdb)
February 2, 2021 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren KW Brennan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Eric Miller (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30365008) filed by Plaintiff Eric Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Tatar, Stephanie)
January 29, 2021 Filing 23 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan P. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Accurate Background, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/28/2021, Receipt No. 30290521) filed by defendant Accurate Background, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hagopian, David)
January 29, 2021 Filing 22 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Henry M. Perlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Accurate Background, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 1/28/2021, Receipt No. 30290277) filed by defendant Accurate Background, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hagopian, David)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Text Only Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James A. Francis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Eric Miller #17 by Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 28, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Henry M. Perlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Accurate Background, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30290277) #18 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan P. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Accurate Background, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30290521) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (Thrasher, Lupe)
January 28, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan P. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Accurate Background, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30290521) filed by defendant Accurate Background, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hagopian, David)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Henry M. Perlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Accurate Background, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30290277) filed by defendant Accurate Background, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hagopian, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James A. Francis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Eric Miller (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30243293) filed by Plaintiff Eric Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1: Information pertaining to NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Tatar, Stephanie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Accurate Background, LLC answer now due 2/12/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Accurate Background, LLC.(Attorney David George Hagopian added to party Accurate Background, LLC(pty:dft))(Hagopian, David)
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Miller, upon Defendant Accurate Background, LLC served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation, authorized agent for service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Tatar, Stephanie)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey B. Sand APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eric Miller Plaintiff, designating Stephanie Tatar as local counsel. (twdb)
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Branden Sand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Eric Miller (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29605369) filed by Plaintiff Eric Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Tatar, Stephanie)
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): These documents were not flatten. (ghap)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Accurate Background, LLC. (ghap)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lauren K Brennan on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James A Francis on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey B Sand on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eric Miller. (Tatar, Stephanie)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eric Miller, (Tatar, Stephanie)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eric Miller. (Tatar, Stephanie)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29504434 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eric Miller. (Attorney Stephanie R Tatar added to party Eric Miller(pty:pla))(Tatar, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Miller v. Accurate Background, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accurate Background, LLC
Represented By: David George Hagopian
Represented By: Brent Mathew Giddens
Represented By: Megan P. Mitchell
Represented By: Henry M. Perlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Miller
Represented By: Stephanie R Tatar
Represented By: Stephanie R. Tatar
Represented By: Jeffrey Branden Sand
Represented By: James A. Francis
Represented By: Lauren K.W. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?