March 27, 2024 |
Filing
107
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JUSTIN ROBERT KING 106 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Secur ities Exchange Act of 1934 (the "Exchange Act") [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder [17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facilit y of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (a) to employ any device, scheme, or artifice to defraud; (b) to make any untrue statement of a material fact or to omit to state a material fact necess ary in order to make the statements made, in the light of the circumstances under which they were made, not misleading; or (c) to engage in any act, practice, or course of business which operates or would operate as a fraud or deceit upon any person. [See judgment for details.] (lom)
|
January 24, 2022 |
Filing
77
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO RELIEF DEFENDANT SHANNON LEIGH KING by Judge James V. Selna, IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Relief Defendant is liable for disgorgement in the amount of $398,000, plus prejudgment interest thereon i n the amount of $11,037.98, which amounts shall be deemed satisfied by the funds currently in the possession of the Court-appointed Receiver in this action. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 74 [See Judgment for further details.] (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
|
January 18, 2022 |
Filing
71
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ELEVATE INVESTMENTS LLC by Judge James V. Selna, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securiti es Exchange Act of 1934 (the Exchange Act) [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder [17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any nat ional securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (a) to employ any device, scheme, or artifice to defraud; (b) to make any untrue statement of a material fact or to omit to state a material fact necessary i n order to make the statements made, in the light of the circumstances under which they were made, not misleading; or (c) to engage in any act, practice, or course of business which operates or would operate as a fraud or deceit upon any person . IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for disgorgement in the amount of $2,354,884, plus prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $65,309.50, representing net profits gained as a result of th e conduct alleged in the Complaint, which amounts shall be deemed satisfied by the funds currently in the possession of the Court-appointed Receiver in this action. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment, 70 [See Judgment for further details.] (es)
|
May 27, 2021 |
Filing
67
JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JUSTIN ROBERT KING 66 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities E xchange Act of 1934 (the "Exchange Act") [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder [17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (a) to employ any device, scheme, or artifice to defraud; (b) to make any untrue statement of a material fact or to omit to state a material fact necessary in or der to make the statements made, in the light of the circumstances under which they were made, not misleading; or (c) to engage in any act, practice, or course of business which operates or would operate as a fraud or deceit upon any person. [See document for further details.] (es)
|
February 18, 2021 |
Filing
47
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CIVIL CONTEMPT AGAINST AGAINST DEFENDANT JUSTIN ROBERT KING AND RELIEF DEFENDANT SHANNON LEIGH KING by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on March 15, 2021 at 1:30 p.m., SKing and JKing shall appear befo re this Court to show cause why an order of civil contempt should not be issued and, at that time. Any opposition papers shall be filed and served no later than March 1, 2021 and any reply papers shall be filed and served no later than March 8, 2 021. In addition to the service requirements under this Court's Local Rules, both the SEC and JKing and SKing shall provide the Court and each other with courtesy copies, via email, of all papers filed by no later than 5:00 p.m. PST on the date the papers are due. JKing and SKing shall advise the Court of any subsequent efforts to cure the acts of noncompliance with the Preliminary Injunction alleged by the SEC. (es)
|
January 19, 2021 |
Filing
26
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND APPOINTMENT OF A PERMANENT RECEIVER by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the SEC's Motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no bond shall be required in connection with the appointment of the permanent receiver. [See document for details.] (es)
|