Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company et al v. Scotsman Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Defendant: Scotsman Group, LLC, Regal Beloit Corporation, Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc., Ingersoll Rand, Inc. and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv00029
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
March 4, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Scotsman Group, LLC.(Attorney Matthew Allen Stein added to party Scotsman Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Stein, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Local Rule 26-1 Report filed by Plaintiff Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Joint Rule 26(f) Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Joint Rule 26(f) Report)(Jeans-Berezowsky, Lubomyr)
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc., re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 served on 2/19/2021. (Konold, Jeffery)
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffery Todd Konold counsel for Defendant Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc.. Adding Tiffany K. Ackley as counsel of record for Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc.. (Konold, Jeffery)
February 19, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffery Todd Konold counsel for Defendant Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc.. Adding Jason F. Meyer as counsel of record for Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffery Todd Konold added to party Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc.(pty:dft))(Konold, Jeffery)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Edwards APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ingersoll Rand Inc Defendant, designating Bart L. Kessel as local counsel. (twdb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll Rand, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30169637) filed by Defendant Ingersoll Rand, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kessel, Bart)
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), / Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Ingersoll Rand, Inc., Regal Beloit Corporation.(Attorney Bart L. Kessel added to party Ingersoll Rand, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kessel, Bart)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc., re Notice (Other) #5 served on January 11, 2021. (Konold, Jeffery)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT KATOM RESTAURANT SUPPLY, INC. filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc.. (Konold, Jeffery)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, upon Defendant Regal Beloit Corporation served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Long, Customer Service Representative in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/14/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 8, 2021 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ingersoll Rand, Inc., Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc., Regal Beloit Corporation, Scotsman Group, LLC.Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/08/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 8, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, upon Defendant Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc. served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patricia Bible, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 8, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, upon Defendant Ingersoll Rand, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Ryan C. Edwards, Counsel. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/23/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 8, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, upon Defendant Scotsman Group, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/15/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Regal Beloit Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 1/8/2021. (Kessel, Bart)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Regal Beloit Corporation, identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc.. (Kessel, Bart)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Regal Beloit Corporation. (Kessel, Bart)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01173483-CU-NP-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-29942233 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Regal Beloit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bart L. Kessel) (Attorney Bart L. Kessel added to party Regal Beloit Corporation(pty:bkmov))(Kessel, Bart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company et al v. Scotsman Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotsman Group, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Allen Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Beloit Corporation
Represented By: Bart L. Kessel
Represented By: Jane Harrington Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katom Restaurant Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery Todd Konold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand, Inc.
Represented By: Jane Harrington Davidson
Represented By: Ryan C. Edwards
Represented By: Bart L. Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark C Bauman
Represented By: Lubomyr B. Jeans-Berezowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?