G and H Diversified Manufacturing LP v. Regreen Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: G&H Diversified Manufacturing LP and G and H Diversified Manufacturing LP
Defendant: Albert Avedis Mardikian, Regreen Technologies, Inc. and Regreen International Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00062
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISCHARGE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. In light of the filing of Defendants' Answer #11 and Plaintiff's Response #15 , the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff G and H Diversified Manufacturing LPto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #10 (Kossoff, Alan)
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Service filed by Defendants Albert Avedis Mardikian, Regreen Technologies, Inc. re: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 (Gardner, Dixon)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The signature is missing from 11-1, page 2. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on May 13, 2021. (cw)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Albert Avedis Mardikian, Regreen Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2021.) (twdb)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff G and H Diversified Manufacturing LP, upon Defendant Regreen Technologies, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Dixon Gardner, Attorney. (Kossoff, Alan)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff G and H Diversified Manufacturing LP, upon Defendant Albert Avedis Mardikian acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Dixon Gardner, Attorney. (Kossoff, Alan)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Albert Avedis Mardikian and Regreen Technologies, Inc. (jtil)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff G&H Diversified Manufacturing LP, identifying Kash Holdings LLC; Janan Kash; Edward Kash. (Kossoff, Alan)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff G&H Diversified Manufacturing LP. (Kossoff, Alan)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff G&H Diversified Manufacturing LP. (Kossoff, Alan)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29999070 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff G&H Diversified Manufacturing LP. (Attorney Alan R Kossoff added to party G&H Diversified Manufacturing LP(pty:pla))(Kossoff, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G and H Diversified Manufacturing LP v. Regreen Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Avedis Mardikian
Represented By: Dixon L Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regreen Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Dixon L Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regreen International Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Dixon L Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&H Diversified Manufacturing LP
Represented By: Alan R Kossoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G and H Diversified Manufacturing LP
Represented By: Alan R Kossoff
Represented By: Nicholas Cooper Soltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?