Brian Whitaker v. Ba and sh America Corp
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Ba and sh America Corp.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00111
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. (See document for further information). (jp)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ba&sh America Corp. #16 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gutierrez, Faythe)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ba&sh America Corp. filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Application set for hearing on 7/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Proposed Judgement) (Gutierrez, Faythe)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On February 18, 2021, the Court issued an Order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution #11 . On February 13, 2021, Plaintiff filed a Request for Clerk to Enter Default #13 . Default was subsequently entered. In light of this responsive filing, the Court hereby orders the OSC discharged. *Plaintiff shall file an appropriate Motion for Default Judgment no later than March 10, 2021.* THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Ba and sh America Corp. (jp)
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Ba and sh America Corp. filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Gutierrez, Faythe)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Gutierrez, Faythe)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 2/25/2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Ba and sh America Corp. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent Information Cogency Global Inc. -Sharmaine Harris, Administrative Assistant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kdu)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (kdu)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ba and sh America Corp. (et)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30130733 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Ba and sh America Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez
Represented By: Chris Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ba and sh America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?