In Re Igor Shabanets
Appellant: Igor Shabanets
Appellee: Richard Marshack
Case Number: 8:2021cv00114
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Certification of Interested Parties was not submitted in accordance with Rule 2.1 of the Local Rules Governing Bankruptcy Appeals, Cases, and Proceedings (Chapter IV) forwarded to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (ghap)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree forwarded to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (ghap)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 1/19/2021. (ghap)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: copy of order, judgment or decree is not included entered on 12/18/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Theodor Albert, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/18/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:19-bk-14912-TA, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Igor Shabanets. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Igor Shabanets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Igor Shabanets
Represented By: Bruce Allan Boice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard Marshack
Represented By: D Edward Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?