Clifford Chaun Loyer v. Patrick Covello
Petitioner: Clifford Chaun Loyer
Respondent: Patrick Covello
Case Number: 8:2021cv00233
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Points in Support of OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss #9 filed by Petitioner Clifford Chaun Loyer. (hr)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss #7 filed by Petitioner Clifford Chaun Loyer. (hr)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #7 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #1 (Attachments: #1 Lodgment No. 1, #2 Lodgment No. 2, #3 Lodgment No. 3, #4 Lodgment No. 4, #5 Lodgment No. 5, #6 Lodgment No. 6, #7 Lodgment No. 7, #8 Lodgment No. 8, #9 Lodgment No. 9, #10 Lodgment No. 10, #11 Lodgment No. 11, #12 Lodgment No. 12, #13 Lodgment No. 13, #14 Lodgment No. 14, #15 Lodgment No. 15, #16 Lodgment No. 16, #17 Lodgment No. 17, #18 Lodgment No. 18, #19 Lodgment No. 19, #20 Lodgment No. 20, #21 Lodgment No. 21, #22 Lodgement No. 22, #23 Lodgment No. 23)(Chenelia, Kristen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Patrick Covello. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Chenelia, Kristen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Clifford Chaun Loyer. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #1 . Receipt number LA218986. (fr)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia on behalf of Respondent Patrick Covello (Attorney Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia added to party Patrick Covello(pty:res))(Chenelia, Kristen)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Within fourteen (14) days, respondent shall file and serve a notice of appearance. Respondent shall file a response to the Petition within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (see document for further details). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (hr)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING REQUIREMENTS FOR PREPARATION AND SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Petitioner is advised of the following requirements for preparing and submitting documents in this case: (see document for further details). (hr)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-69) (ghap)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Clifford Chaun Loyer. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford Chaun Loyer v. Patrick Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford Chaun Loyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Covello
Represented By: Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?