Eric Kelly v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America, et al
Plaintiff: Eric Kelly
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv00291
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America, (Maguire, Daniel)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Maguire, Daniel)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 4/1/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Unum Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly, upon Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trudy Desbiens, person authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McKennon, Robert)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (esa)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Eric Kelly. (McKennon, Robert)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties (McKennon, Robert)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly. (McKennon, Robert)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30529846 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly. (Attorney Robert J McKennon added to party Eric Kelly(pty:pla))(McKennon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Kelly v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Kelly
Represented By: Robert J McKennon
Represented By: Michael Paul Lavigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Represented By: Karen T Tsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?