J. B. G. v. Altamed Health Service Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jackqueline Becerra Galarza, Maria Galarza and J. B. G.
Defendant: Dr. Kevin D Haley, Altamed Health Services Corporation, Dr. Donald D. Maldonado, Donald E. Maldonado, Kevin D Haley and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv00298
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 22 Corrected First Amended AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #18 , filed by Plaintiff J. B. G.(Weinberg, Trevor)
April 14, 2021 Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #20 . Counsel is ordered to correct the issues denoted in the Deficiency. Deadline for correcting the document is 4/16/2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 , Summons Request #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: The caption of the First A/C and the parties listed on page three is not identical. The clerk is not sure which parties to add or terminate. Other error(s) with document(s): Unable to issue the summons. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #18 filed by Plaintiff J. B. G.. (Weinberg, Trevor)
April 6, 2021 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff J. B. G.(Weinberg, Trevor)
March 29, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff J. B. G., upon Defendant Altamed Health Services Corporation served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michelle Murillo in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Weinberg, Trevor)
March 29, 2021 Filing 16 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff J. B. G., upon Defendant Kevin D Haley served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Weinberg, Trevor)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #13 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem, appointing Maria Galarza as Guardian ad Litem for J.B.G. (hr)
February 18, 2021 Filing 13 PETITION for Appointment of Maria Galarza as Guardian ad Litem for J.B.G. filed by Plaintiff J. B. G.. (Weinberg, Trevor)
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff J. B. G., identifying ALTAMED HEALTH SERVICE CORPORATION. (Weinberg, Trevor)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Donald E. Maldonado. (esa)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Kevin D Haley. (esa) Modified on 2/18/2021 (esa).
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Altamed Health Services Corporation. (esa)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 17-1. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The names of individuals known to be minors are contained in documents filed with the Court. Fed R. Civ. P5.2(a) requires that a minors initials be used on documents filed with this Court, unless the Court orders otherwise. (esa)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jackqueline Becerra Galarza, Maria Galarza. (Weinberg, Trevor)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jackqueline Becerra Galarza, Maria Galarza. (Weinberg, Trevor)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jackqueline Becerra Galarza, Maria Galarza. (Weinberg, Trevor)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jackqueline Becerra Galarza, Maria Galarza. (Weinberg, Trevor)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30560705 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Maria Galarza, Jackqueline Becerra Galarza. (Attorney Trevor W. Weinberg added to party Jackqueline Becerra Galarza(pty:pla), Attorney Trevor W. Weinberg added to party Maria Galarza(pty:pla))(Weinberg, Trevor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. B. G. v. Altamed Health Service Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackqueline Becerra Galarza
Represented By: Trevor W. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Galarza
Represented By: Trevor W. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B. G.
Represented By: Trevor W. Weinberg
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kevin D Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altamed Health Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Donald D. Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?