Andrew Leigh v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW LEIGH
Defendant: FCA US LLC, DCH CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE OF TEMECULA, Lithia Motors, Inc. doing business as DCH Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Temecula and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv00316
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Central Justice Center. Case number: 30-02019-01080096-CU-BC-CJC. (jp)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Remand (Doc. #23 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This action is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of California (County of Orange), Case No. 30-2019-01080096-CU-BC-CJC. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (See document for further information). (jp)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case #23 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for October 1, 2021, at 10:30 a.m., is VACATED, and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #23 Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. (Law, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #23 filed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidentiary Objection to Lambert Declaration)(Law, Daniel)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Spencer Peter Hugret counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Vernice T. Louie is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #23 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Carlson Lambert in support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sarah Carlson Lambert, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Spencer P Hugret for Defendant FCA US LLC in place and stead of Attorney Amy Maclear. (jp)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Spencer Peter Hugret counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Amy Patricia Maclear is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings, LLC, FCA Holdco B.V., Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #23 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the document is accepted as filed. *The Court RESETS the motion to correspond with the hearing date provided on the face page of the motion, Friday, October 1, 2021 at 10:30 a.m.*THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #23 filed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. (Law, Daniel)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange filed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Of Plaintiff's Motion To Remand, #2 Declaration of Daniel Law in Supportof Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Remand) (Law, Daniel)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Leigh (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Andrew Leigh(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (mku)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 22, 2022. (mku)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing April 23, 2021, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. See minute order for dates, hearing and other information. (lom)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Regina Lotardo counsel for Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. Karen Wallace is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. (Lotardo, Regina)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates)(Lotardo, Regina)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. Adding Regina Lotardo as counsel of record for Andrew Leigh for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Andrew Leigh(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #14 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #11 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #13 served on 2/25/2021. (Sentlinger, Eric)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for deatils. (mku)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC, Lithia Motors, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Eric D. Sentlinger #2 (car)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC, DCH Chrysler Jeep Dodge of Temecula. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh. Filed in State Court on 6/28/19 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric D. Sentlinger #2 (car)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Filed in State Court on 12/2/19 Submitted with Attachment 5 Exhibit NN to Declaration of Eric D. Sentlinger #2 (Attorney Laura Goldsmith Ryan added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(car)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NON-CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Lithia Motors, Inc. Without prejudice. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit C to Declaration of Eric D. Sentlinger #2 (car) Modified on 2/19/2021 (car).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Andrew Leigh, upon Plaintiff FCA US LLC served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro CT Corporation System Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 7/8/2019 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit M to Declaration of Eric D. Sentlinger #2 (car)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Lithia Motors, Inc. Filed in State Court on 2/28/2020 Submitted with Attachment 6 Exhibit YY to Declaration of Eric D. Sentlinger #2 (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Lithia Motors, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Goldsmith Ryan added to party Lithia Motors, Inc.(pty:dft))(car)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vernice Trina Louie on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Vernice Trina Louie added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Louie, Vernice)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Patricia Maclear on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Maclear, Amy)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC, FCA HOLDCO B.V., STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Declaration,,,,, #2 served on 02/17/2021. (Sentlinger, Eric)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Eric D. Sentlinger re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J to ES Decl in support of Removal, #2 Exhibit K - T to ES Decl in support of Removal, #3 Exhibit U - Z to ES Decl in support of Removal, #4 Exhibit AA - JJ to ES Decl in support of Removal, #5 Exhibit KK - TT to ES Decl in support of Removal, #6 Exhibit UU - ZZ to ES Decl in support of Removal, #7 Exhibit AAA - CCC to ES Decl in support of Removal, #8 Exhibit DDD Part 1a to ES Decl in support of Removal, #9 Exhibit DDD Part 1b to ES Decl in support of Removal, #10 Exhibit DDD Part 2a to ES Decl in support of Removal, #11 Exhibit DDD Part 2b to ES Decl in support of Removal, #12 Exhibit DDD Part 3 to ES Decl in support of Removal, #13 Exhibit EEE - JJJ to ES Decl in support of Removal, #14 Exhibit KKK to ES Decl in support of Removal, #15 Exhibit LLL Part 1a to ES Decl in support of Removal, #16 Exhibit LLL Part 1b to ES Decl in support of Removal, #17 Exhibit LLL Part 2 to ES Decl in support of Removal, #18 Exhibit MMM - ZZZ to ES Decl in support of Removal, #19 Exhibit AAAA - EEEE to ES Decl in support of Removal)(Sentlinger, Eric)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01080096-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-30584492 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Leigh v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Represented By: Amy Patricia Maclear
Represented By: Vernice Trina Louie
Represented By: Laura Goldsmith Ryan
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCH CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE OF TEMECULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Motors, Inc. doing business as DCH Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat of Temecula
Represented By: Laura Goldsmith Ryan
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW LEIGH
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Karen L Wallace
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?