Marcos Castro v. Graphic Packaging International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marcos Castro
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, Inc., Graphic Packaging International, LLC and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv00448
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Marcos Castro.. (Tulyathan, Kwanporn)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
March 10, 2021 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Marcos Castro, upon Defendant Graphic Packaging International, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 1/20/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Phillip G Simpler, Counsel. (submitted as document 1, attachment 3, p. 5) (esa)
March 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Graphic Packaging International, Inc., Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (filed in state court 3/10/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 24)(esa)
March 10, 2021 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Marcos Castro, upon Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 1/26/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Phillip G Simpler, Counsel. (submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 21) (esa)
March 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Graphic Packaging International, Inc., Graphic Packaging International, LLC, filed by plaintiff Marcos Castro. (filed in state court 12/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Graphic Packaging International, Inc., Graphic Packaging International, LLC, (Simpler, Phillip)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Graphic Packaging International, Inc., Graphic Packaging International, LLC identifying Graphic Packaging International LLC as Corporate Parent. (Simpler, Phillip)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Graphic Packaging International, Inc., Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Simpler, Phillip)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01172807-CU-OE-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-30895217 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Graphic Packaging International, Inc., Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phillip G. Simpler, #2 Ex A to Simpler Dec, #3 Ex B to Simpler Dec, #4 Ex C to Simpler Dec, #5 Ex D to Simpler Dec, #6 EX E to Simpler Dec, #7 Declaration of Amelia Hoke, #8 Ex F to Hoke Dec, #9 Declaration of E. Jewelle Johnson) (Attorney Phillip G Simpler added to party Graphic Packaging International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip G Simpler added to party Graphic Packaging International, LLC(pty:dft))(Simpler, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcos Castro v. Graphic Packaging International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Castro
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Represented By: Kwanporn Tulyathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip G Simpler
Represented By: Danielle Hultenius Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Represented By: Phillip G Simpler
Represented By: Danielle Hultenius Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?