Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. v. TCL China Star Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.
Defendant: TCL Technology Group Corporation, TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, TCT Mobile, Inc., TCT Mobile (US) Inc., TCL China Star Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd., TTE Technology, Inc. and TCT Mobile US Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00554
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS TO WAIVE SERVICE AND TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 90 DAYS (DKT #19 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 15, 2021. (lom)
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 15, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradford Cangro, #2 Proposed Order)(Marchese, Christopher)
April 14, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon TCT Mobile US Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Svc., Registered Agent for Service (CORRECTED VERSION OF DOCKET 14) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Barkan, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., of Standing Orders of Judge Kronstadt and Notice and Order re Transfer and/or Reassignment of Patent Case served on 3/31/2021. (Barkan, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., upon Defendant TTE Technology, Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, CT Corporation, Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Barkan, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., upon Defendant TCT Mobile, Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Svc., Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Barkan, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., upon Defendant TCT Mobile US Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Svc., Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Barkan, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., upon Defendant TCL Technology Group Corporation served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Registered Agent for TCT Mobile Inc. and TCT Mobile (US) Inc., Zack Whilhite, Office Administrator for TCT Mobile Inc. and TCT Mobile (US) Inc., and Gabriela Sanchez, Registered Agent (Intake Specialist) for TTE Technology Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitysubstituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitya.Original Summons NOT returned. (Barkan, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., upon Defendant TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Registered Agent for TCT Mobile Inc. and TCT Mobile (US) Inc., Zack Whilhite, Office Administrator for TCT Mobile Inc. and TCT Mobile (US) Inc., and Gabriela Sanchez, Registered Agent (Intake Specialist) for TTE Technology Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitysubstituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitya.Original Summons NOT returned. (Barkan, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., upon Defendant TCL China Star Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Registered Agent for TCT Mobile Inc. and TCT Mobile (US) Inc., Zack Whilhite, Office Administrator for TCT Mobile Inc. and TCT Mobile (US) Inc., and Gabriela Sanchez, Registered Agent (Intake Specialist) for TTE Technology Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitysubstituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitya.Original Summons NOT returned. (Barkan, David)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 8:21-cv-00554 JAK(ADSx). (rn)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants TCL China Star Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited, TCL Technology Group Corporation, TCT Mobile US Inc., TCT Mobile, Inc., TTE Technology, Inc. (ghap)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.. (Marchese, Christopher)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd., identifying TDK Corporation, Sony Corporation, Neotec Yugen-Kaisha. (Marchese, Christopher)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.. (Marchese, Christopher)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.. (Marchese, Christopher)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30980457 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (Attorney Christopher S Marchese added to party Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.(pty:pla))(Marchese, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. v. TCL China Star Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Technology Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Communication Technology Holdings Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCT Mobile, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCT Mobile (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL China Star Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTE Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCT Mobile US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher S Marchese
Represented By: David M. Barkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?