Adam Figueroa et al v. Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC
Plaintiff: Adam Figueroa
Defendant: DOES 1-50, Genesis Healthcare, LLC and Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00623
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and MOTION to Strike Complaint #10 filed by Defendant Genesis Healthcare, LLC. (Attorney Daniel K Dik added to party Genesis Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft))(Dik, Daniel)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and MOTION to Strike Complaint #10 filed by Defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- HHS Dec of PH Emergency, #3 Exhibit C- Newsom Dec 3.4.20, #4 Exhibit D- WHO Covid 19 March 11, 2020, #5 Exhibit E- Trump Dec of Emergency 3.13.20, #6 Exhibit F- 3.15.20 COVID 19 Facilties, #7 Exhibit G- 7.16.20 and 8.5.20 CDPH, #8 Exhibit H- Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit I- PREP Act Dec, #10 Exhibit J- Amended Dec PREP, #11 Exhibit K- 2nd Amend PREP Dec, #12 Exhibit L- CDC January 8, 2020, #13 Exhibit M- CDC January 17, 2020, #14 Exhibit N- CDC January 24, 2020, #15 Exhibit O- CDC February 1, 2020 Updated Guidance, #16 Exhibit P- CDPH AFLs January and February 2020, #17 Exhibit Q- CMS February 6, 2020 Memo, #18 Exhibit R- CDC February 28 2020 updated interim guidance, #19 Exhibit S- March 1 or 3, 2020 CDC Strategies, #20 Exhibit T- CDPH AFL March 3, 2020, #21 Exhibit U- CMS March 4, 2020 Memo, #22 Exhibit V- CDC March 8, 2020 Updated Guidance, #23 Exhibit W- CDC March 10, 2020, #24 Exhibit X- CMS March 10, 2020 Memo, #25 Exhibit Y- CDPH AFL 20-22- March 11, 2020, #26 Exhibit Z- CMS March 13, 2020 memo, #27 Exhibit AA- March 17, 2020 CDC memos, #28 Exhibit BB- CMS March 20, 2020 QSO 20-20, #29 Exhibit CC- March 21, 2020 CDC Prep for Covid-19, #30 Exhibit DD- April 2, 2020 CMS Covid-19 LTCF Guidance, #31 Exhibit EE- 4.17.20 OCG AO, #32 Exhibit FF- List Countermeasures, #33 Exhibit GG- 10.22.20 HHS AO, #34 Exhibit HH- OGC AO 1.8.2021, #35 Exhibit II- 4th Amended HHS Dec, #36 Exhibit JJ- 5th Amended HHS Dec, #37 Exhibit KK- 8.14.20 HHS-Letter, #38 Exhibit LL- March 30 2020 AFL, #39 Exhibit OO- April 6, 2020 CDC, #40 Exhibit PP- 4.13.20 CDPH AFL20-39, #41 Exhibit QQ- Designation of Scarce Materials by HHS)(Canavan, Ryan)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Ryan G. Canavan in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and MOTION to Strike Complaint #10 filed by Defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MM- Meet and Confer letter to Plaintiffs' Counsel, #2 Exhibit NN- Email to Plaintiffs' Counsel following up on M&C)(Canavan, Ryan)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Kim S. Cruz in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and MOTION to Strike Complaint #10 filed by Defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC. (Canavan, Ryan)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and MOTION to Strike Complaint filed by Defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Canavan, Ryan)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC answer now due 5/7/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC.(Cruz, Kim)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:21-cv-00623 JLS (KESx). (jtil)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-PREP Act Dec, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Dec Invoking PREP Act, #4 Exhibit D-Second Amended Dec Invoking PREP Act, #5 Exhibit E-Fourth Amended HHS Dec, #6 Exhibit F-HHS Letter PREP Act 8.14.20, #7 Exhibit G-HHS Advisory Opinion 10.22.20, #8 Exhibit H-PREP Act Advisory Op by HHS, #9 Exhibit I-PREP Act Covered Devices and Tests, #10 Exhibit J-CDC 1.8.20, #11 Exhibit K-CDC 1.17.20, #12 Exhibit L-CDC 1.24.20, #13 Exhibit M-CDC 2.1.20 Updated Guidance, #14 Exhibit N-CDPH AFLS Jan and Feb 2020, #15 Exhibit O-CMS 2.6.20 memo, #16 Exhibit P-CDC 2.28.20 Updated Guidance, #17 Exhibit Q-March 1 or 30 2020 CDC Strategies, #18 Exhibit R-CDPH AFL 3.3.20, #19 Exhibit S-CMS 3.4.20 Memo, #20 Exhibit T-CDC 3.8.20 Updated Guidance, #21 Exhibit U-CDC 3.10.20, #22 Exhibit V-CMS 3.10.20 Memo, #23 Exhibit W-CDPH AFL 20-22 3.11.20, #24 Exhibit X-CMS 3.13.20 Memo, #25 Exhibit Y-3.17.20 CDC Memos, #26 Exhibit Z-CMS 3.20.20 QSO 20-20, #27 Exhibit AA-3.21.20 CDC Prep for Covid 19, #28 Exhibit BB-4.2.20 CMS Covid 19 LTCF Guidance, #29 Exhibit CC-Fifth Amended Dec under the PREP Act, #30 Exhibit DD-HHS Advisory Opinion 21-01 1.8.21, #31 Exhibit EE-Statement of Interest Bolton v. Gallatin Center)(Canavan, Ryan)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC, (Canavan, Ryan)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC. (Canavan, Ryan)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01186015-CU-PO-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-31034009 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan G. Canavan) (Attorney Ryan G. Canavan added to party Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC(pty:dft))(Canavan, Ryan)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Adam Figueroa in Orange County Superior Court 2/24/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam Figueroa et al v. Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Daniel K Dik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anaheim Terrace Care Center LLC
Represented By: William C Wilson
Represented By: Kim Suzanne Cruz
Represented By: Evan J. Topol
Represented By: Colin M Harrison
Represented By: Ryan G. Canavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Figueroa
Represented By: Dawn Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?