Jane Doe v. Reddit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, Jane Does and John Does
Defendant: Reddit, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00768
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 62 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-56293 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #61 as to plaintiff Jane Doe, Jane Does, John Does. (es)
November 29, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Jane Does, John Does. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case #60 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32396551.) (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS by Judge James V. Selna. The Court DISMISSES all claims with prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
October 27, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Non-Amendment filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Jane Does, John Does. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: Defendant Reddit, Inc. ("Reddit") filed a motion to dismiss the complaint of Plaintiffs Jane Does Nos. 1-6 and John Does Nos. 2, 3, and 5 (collectively "Plaintiffs"). Mot., Dkt. No. #40 . Plaintiffs filed an opposition. Opp'n, ECF No. #43 . Reddit responded. Reply, ECF No. #44 . Plaintiffs filed a request for a hearing. Request, Dkt. No. #55 . Reddit opposed the request for hearing. Dkt. No. #57 . The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter. For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. [See document for details.] (es)
September 29, 2021 Filing 57 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.to REQUEST for Hearing Regarding Motion to Dismiss, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 , #55 (Kapur, Theano)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Hearing Request by Judge James V. Selna: On September 21, 2021, Plaintiffs Jane Does Nos. 1-6 and John Does Nos. 2, 3,and 5 (collectively, "Plaintiffs") filed a request for oral argument, advancing various reasons why it believes a hearing is necessary. See Dkt. No. #55 . The Court requests that Reddit, Inc. file a brief, not to exceed five pages, responding to the arguments in Plaintiffs' request, by September 29, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. (es) Modified on 9/23/2021 (lb).
September 21, 2021 Filing 55 REQUEST for Hearing Regarding Motion to Dismiss, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 , filed by Plaintiffs' Jane Doe, Jane Does, John Does. Request set for hearing on 10/4/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
September 13, 2021 Filing 54 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Jane Does, John Doesto Notice of Decision by other Court #52 (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
September 10, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.to Notice (Other) #50 Supplemental Authority (Kapur, Theano)
September 10, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Decision: Supplemental Authority filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kapur, Theano)
September 10, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Halley Wilder Josephs on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Jane Does, John Does (Attorney Halley Wilder Josephs added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Halley Wilder Josephs added to party Jane Does(pty:pla), Attorney Halley Wilder Josephs added to party John Does(pty:pla))(Josephs, Halley)
September 9, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Jane Does, John Does. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
September 3, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Krysta Kauble Pachman to Arun Subramanian. filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Jane Does, John Does, (Subramanian, Arun)
August 30, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.to Notice (Other) #47 of Supplemental Authority (Kapur, Theano)
August 26, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE filed by plaintiffs Jane Does, John Does. Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING AUGUST 23, 2021 HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS #45 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The hearing date for Reddits Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, is rescheduled to Monday, September 20, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. *NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT.* (es)
August 18, 2021 Filing 45 STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kapur, Theano)
August 9, 2021 Filing 44 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of M. Dore in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Kapur, Theano)
August 2, 2021 Filing 43 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does, John Does. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krysta Kauble Pachman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES #41 by Judge James V. Selna. Jury Trial set for 9/6/2022 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2022 at 11:00 AM. Discovery cutoff (fact and expert) 5/23/22. Last day for hearing motions 7/18/22 at 1:30 PM. [See document for details] (es)
July 21, 2021 Filing 41 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Case Management Dates filed by plaintiffs Jane Does, John Does. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Davida P. Brook added to party Jane Does(pty:pla), Attorney Davida P. Brook added to party John Does(pty:pla))(Brook, Davida)
July 21, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (Challenged Pleading)) (Kapur, Theano)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS #36 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiffs Jane Does No. 1-6 and John Does No. 2, 3, and 5, and in the case of Jane Does No. 2-6 and John Does No. 2, 3, and 5, their minor daughters, shall be permitted to proceed under pseudonyms in this litigation. Provided an appropriate protective order is in place, the true name of plaintiffs and their minor daughters shall be disclosed upon request to the defendant. (es)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] Scheduling Conference by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial September 6, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference August 22, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Stay at Docket 35 extends to Rule 26 initial disclosures. [See document for details.] Scheduling Conference set for July 19, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. is ordered VACATED. (es)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb)
July 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS filed by plaintiffs Jane Does, John Does. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krysta Kauble Pachman, #2 Proposed Order) (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Stay Discovery #25 by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. [See document for details.] (es)
July 9, 2021 Filing 34 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Case, #24 filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. (Kapur, Theano)
July 8, 2021 Filing 33 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Jane Does, John Does.. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge James V. Selna: On July 7, 2021, Plaintiff Jane Doe filed a First Amended Complaint. ECF No. 31. The Court therefore VACATES the hearing on Defendant Reddit, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss set for July 19, 2021, as MOOT. (es)
July 7, 2021 Filing 31 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Reddit, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiffs Jane Does, John Does(Attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman added to party Jane Does(pty:pla), Attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman added to party John Does(pty:pla))(Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
July 5, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending STAY DISCOVERY pending Resolution of Dispositive Motions #25 filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. (Kapur, Theano)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Tamar Lusztig APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe, designating Krysta Kauble Pachman as local counsel. (es)
June 29, 2021 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tamar Lusztig to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31549541) filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
June 28, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending STAY DISCOVERY pending Resolution of Dispositive Motions #25 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
June 23, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Intent to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
June 21, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending STAY DISCOVERY pending Resolution of Dispositive Motions filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/19/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Dore, #2 Exhibit A, Dore Decl'n, #3 Exhibit B, Dore Decl'n, #4 Exhibit C, Dore Decl'n, #5 Exhibit D, Dore Decl'n, #6 Proposed Order re Motion to Stay, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Declaration of T. Evangelis, #9 Exhibit A, Evangelis Decl'n, #10 Exhibit B, Evangelis Decl'n, #11 Exhibit C, Evangelis Decl'n, #12 Exhibit D, Evangelis Decl'n, #13 Proposed Order re Request for Judicial Notice) (Kapur, Theano)
June 16, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/19/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (challenged pleading)) (Kapur, Theano)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 7/19/2021 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/12/2021. (lb)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR REDDIT, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #21 , by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The deadline for Reddit to respond to the Complaint shall be June 16, 2021. (es)
May 7, 2021 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reddit, Inc. answer now due 6/16/2021, filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kapur, Theano)
May 7, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Kapur, Theano)
May 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc., (Kapur, Theano)
May 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael H Dore on behalf of Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Attorney Michael H Dore added to party Reddit, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dore, Michael)
May 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristin A Linsley on behalf of Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Attorney Kristin A Linsley added to party Reddit, Inc.(pty:dft))(Linsley, Kristin)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theano Evangelis Kapur on behalf of Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Attorney Theano Evangelis Kapur added to party Reddit, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kapur, Theano)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, upon Defendant Reddit, Inc. served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lai Saevang, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Arun Subramanian APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Jane Doe, designating Krysta Kauble Pachman as local counsel. (es)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Steve M. Cohen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jane Doe, designating Krysta Kauble Pachman as local counsel. (es)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arun Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31190038) filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steve M. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31187991) filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steve Cohen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Arun Subramanian. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Reddit, Inc. (esa)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31169070 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla))(Kauble Pachman, Krysta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. Reddit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Davida P. Brook
Represented By: Krysta Kauble Pachman
Represented By: Arun Subramanian
Represented By: Steve M. Cohen
Represented By: Halley Wilder Josephs
Represented By: Tamar E. Lusztig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Does
Represented By: Arun Subramanian
Represented By: Davida P. Brook
Represented By: Halley Wilder Josephs
Represented By: Krysta Kauble Pachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does
Represented By: Arun Subramanian
Represented By: Davida P. Brook
Represented By: Halley Wilder Josephs
Represented By: Krysta Kauble Pachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reddit, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin A Linsley
Represented By: Michael H Dore
Represented By: Theano Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Michael H. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?