SpinTouch, Inc. v. Outform, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SpinTouch, Inc.
Defendant: Outform, Inc., Does 1-10 and Ariel Haroush
Case Number: 8:2021cv00840
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CIVILL CASE by Judge David O. Carter, re Notice (Other) #145 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb)
December 15, 2022 Filing 145 Notice of Settlement of Entire Action filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
December 13, 2022 Filing 144 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Status Conference set for 12/16/2022 04:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 21, 2022 Filing 143 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Jury Trial CONTINUED to 1/3/2023 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 20, 2022 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Non-party Requestor for Court Reporter. Court will contact Stephanie Lambarena at lambarena@fr.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (ls)
October 17, 2022 Filing 139 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Status Conference set for 10/18/2022 at 1:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 13, 2022 Filing 138 Joint Stipulations of Fact -- MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. (Weir, Charles)
October 12, 2022 Filing 137 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2022 12:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2022 Filing 136 STATEMENT Case ( Joint Statement) filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc. JOINT STATEMENT OF CASE (Weisskopf, Stephen)
October 11, 2022 Filing 135 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
October 11, 2022 Filing 134 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc... (Weisskopf, Stephen)
October 11, 2022 Filing 133 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc... (Weisskopf, Stephen)
October 11, 2022 Filing 132 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. (Weir, Charles)
October 11, 2022 Filing 131 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc... (Weir, Charles)
October 11, 2022 Filing 130 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc... (Weir, Charles)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTES CHAMBERS): ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE 100109 by Judge David O. Carter. For the reasons explained above, the Court DENIES Dkts. #100 #102 #103 #104 #105 #106 #108 ; and GRANTS Dkts. #107 #109 . (lom)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE #127 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court has received, reviewed, and considered the Stipulation to Continue the Trial Date (Stipulation) filed jointly by the parties. NOW THEREFORE, believing that good cause exists for approving the Stipulation, the Court hereby ORDERS that the trial is hereby continued from October 11, 2022 to October 18, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm)
September 13, 2022 Filing 127 Joint STIPULATION to Continue the Trial Date from October 11, 2022 to November 8, 2022 or a date thereafter that is convenient for the Court filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weir, Charles)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Due to scheduling conflicts, the Court on its own motion CONTINUES the trial in this matter from September 20, 2022, to October 11, 2022 8:30 AM. (lc)
September 2, 2022 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Outform, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Susanne Woods at swoods@mwe.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Donovan, William)
August 30, 2022 Filing 124 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: The Court finds Motions in Limine #100 #101 #102 #103 #104 #105 #106 #107 #108 and #109 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for AUGUST 30, 2022, is removed from the calendar and the motions are taken under submission. No appearances are necessary for AUGUST 30, 2022 AT 11:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 29, 2022 Filing 123 MINUTES OF Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Any Witness Not Disclosed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) #100 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Richard Slovenko from Testifying at Trial #101 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Wesley L. Nutten from Testifying at Trial #102 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Lost Profits, Speculative Damages, and Other Evidence #103 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Certain Damages Per the Warranty #104 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Video Exhibits at Trial #105 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Plaintiff's Hearsay Communications with Omron Electronic Components LLC and Sunchip Technology Co. Ltd. #106 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Demonstration of the iDisplay Device at Trial #107 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Use of Third-Party Ronen Simhi's Deposition Testimony at Trial #108 ; Deft.'s MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) Requesting Sequestering of Witnesses #109 held before Judge David O. Carter. The motion hearing is continued to August 30, 2022 at 11:00 AM. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (lom)
August 29, 2022 Filing 122 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #121 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 26, 2022 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy E. Han on behalf of Defendant Ariel Haroush (Attorney Amy E. Han added to party Ariel Haroush(pty:dft))(Han, Amy)
August 25, 2022 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Stephen D. Weisskopf re Response in Opposition to Motion #115 , Response in Opposition to Motion #114 , Response in Opposition to Motion #112 , Response in Opposition to Motion #119 , Response in Opposition to Motion #118 , Response in Opposition to Motion #116 , Response in Opposition to Motion #117 , Response in Opposition to Motion #113 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 119 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Use of Third-Party Ronen Simhi's Deposition Testimony at Trial #108 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 118 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Plaintiff's Hearsay Communications with Omron Electronic Components LLC and Sunchip Technology Co. Ltd. #106 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 117 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Video Exhibits at Trial #105 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 116 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Certain Damages Per the Warranty #104 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 115 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Lost Profits, Speculative Damages, and Other Evidence #103 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 114 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Wesley L. Nutten from Testifying at Trial #102 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 113 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Richard Slovenko from Testifying at Trial #101 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Filing 112 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Any Witness Not Disclosed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) #100 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 18, 2022 Filing 111 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 18, 2022 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Charles E. Weir in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Video Exhibits at Trial #105 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) Requesting Sequestering of Witnesses #109 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Any Witness Not Disclosed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) #100 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Certain Damages Per the Warranty #104 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Demonstration of the iDisplay Device at Trial #107 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Lost Profits, Speculative Damages, and Other Evidence #103 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Use of Third-Party Ronen Simhi's Deposition Testimony at Trial #108 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Wesley L. Nutten from Testifying at Trial #102 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Plaintiff's Hearsay Communications with Omron Electronic Components LLC and Sunchip Technology Co. Ltd. #106 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Richard Slovenko from Testifying at Trial #101 filed by Defendant Outform, Inc. and filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-Part 1, #3 Exhibit B-Part 2, #4 Exhibit B-Part 3, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE)(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) Requesting Sequestering of Witnesses filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Use of Third-Party Ronen Simhi's Deposition Testimony at Trial filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Demonstration of the iDisplay Device at Trial filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 106 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Plaintiff's Hearsay Communications with Omron Electronic Components LLC and Sunchip Technology Co. Ltd. filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Video Exhibits at Trial filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 104 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Certain Damages Per the Warranty filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Lost Profits, Speculative Damages, and Other Evidence filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 102 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Wesley L. Nutten from Testifying at Trial filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Richard Slovenko from Testifying at Trial filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Weir, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 100 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Any Witness Not Disclosed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Daniel R. Campbell)(Weir, Charles)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #97 Plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order Pursuant to FED.R.CIV. Proc. 16 to Give Plaintiff Additional Time to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions in Limine. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 5, 2022 Filing 97 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions in Limine filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Weisskopf, Stephen)
July 25, 2022 Filing 96 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/24/2022 Vol II re Transcript #95 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 25, 2022 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/24/2022 Vol II. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/15/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2022. (aa)
July 1, 2022 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Outform, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Susanne Woods at swoods@mwe.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Donovan, William)
June 29, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/24/2022 transcripts V1 and V3 re Transcript #92 , #91 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 29, 2022 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/24/2022 MSJ hearing Vol. III. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). *Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.* Redaction Request due 7/20/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
June 29, 2022 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/24/2022 MSJ hearing Vol. I.Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). *Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.* Redaction Request due 7/20/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
June 7, 2022 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Outform, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Susanne Woods at swoods@mwe.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Donovan, William)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadline #88 . ( Final Pretrial Conference continued to 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter., Jury Trial continued to 9/20/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
May 26, 2022 Filing 88 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weir, Charles)
May 24, 2022 Filing 87 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: DEFENDANT'S (OUTFORM INC.) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #67 ; DEFENDANT'S (ARIEL HAROUSH) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #72 . The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court hears arguments. Taking under advisement #67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Taking under advisement #72 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale and Court Smart. (twdb)
May 23, 2022 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
May 23, 2022 Filing 85 Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc... (Weisskopf, Stephen)
May 23, 2022 Filing 84 Witness List filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc... (Weisskopf, Stephen)
May 23, 2022 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. (Campbell, Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 82 Witness List filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc... (Campbell, Daniel)
May 17, 2022 Filing 81 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: MOTION hearings for Summary Judgment #67 and #72 are continued to 5/24/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 28, 2022 Filing 80 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: MOTION hearings for Summary Judgment #67 and #72 are continued to 5/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 21, 2022 Filing 79 REPLY filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush -- Supplement Reply to Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Facts [76-1] (Weir, Charles)
April 21, 2022 Filing 78 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #72 filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Weir, Charles)
April 21, 2022 Filing 77 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #67 filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Reply to Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact, #2 Supplement Objections to Evidence, #3 Declaration of Emilie O'Toole, #4 Exhibit TT, #5 Exhibit UU, #6 Exhibit VV, #7 Exhibit WW, #8 Exhibit XX, #9 Exhibit YY)(Donovan, William)
April 14, 2022 Filing 76 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #72 PLAINTIFF SPINTOUCH, INC.S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ARIEL HAROUSHS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PLAINTIFF SPINTOUCH INC.'S STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ARIEL HAROUSHS MOTION FOR SUMMAY JUDGMENT, #2 Declaration Declaration of Paul Hashemi, #3 Declaration Declaration of Wesley L. Nutton, #4 Declaration DECLARATION OF G. RICHARD SLOVENKO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SPINTOUCH, INC.S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A IN SUPPORT OF SLOVANKO's DECLARATION, #6 Declaration DECLARATION OF STEPHEN D. WEISSKOPF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit Exhibit I, #16 Exhibit Exhibit J, #17 Exhibit Exhibit K, #18 Exhibit Exhibit L, #19 Exhibit Exhibit M, #20 Exhibit Exhibit N, #21 Exhibit Exhibit O, #22 Exhibit Exhibit P, #23 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #24 Exhibit Exhibit R, #25 Exhibit Exhibit S, #26 Exhibit Exhibit T, #27 Exhibit Exhibit U)(Weisskopf, Stephen)
April 14, 2022 Filing 75 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #67 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PLAINTIFF SPINTOUCH, INC.'S STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OUTFORM, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMAY JUDGMENT, #2 Declaration Declaration of Paul Hashemi, #3 Declaration Declaration of Wesley L. Nutton, #4 Declaration DECLARATION OF G. RICHARD SLOVENKO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SPINTOUCH, INC.S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A IN SUPPORT OF SLOVANKO's DECLARATION, #6 Declaration DECLARATION OF STEPHEN D. WEISSKOPF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit Exhibit I, #16 Exhibit Exhibit J, #17 Exhibit Exhibit K, #18 Exhibit Exhibit L, #19 Exhibit Exhibit M, #20 Exhibit Exhibit N, #21 Exhibit Exhibit O, #22 Exhibit Exhibit P, #23 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #24 Exhibit Exhibit R, #25 Exhibit Exhibit S, #26 Exhibit Exhibit T, #27 Exhibit Exhibit U)(Weisskopf, Stephen)
April 8, 2022 Filing 74 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING #65 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (twdb)
April 8, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #72 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
April 7, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Weir, #2 Exhibit A to Weir Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Weir Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Weir Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Weir Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Weir Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Weir Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Weir Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Weir Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Weir Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Weir Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Weir Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Weir Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Weir Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Weir Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Weir Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Weir Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Weir Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Weir Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Weir Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Weir Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Weir Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Weir Declaration, #24 Exhibit W to Weir Declaration, #25 Exhibit X to Weir Declaration, #26 Exhibit Y to Weir Declaration, #27 Exhibit Z to Weir Declaration, #28 Exhibit AA to Weir Declaration, #29 Exhibit BB to Weir Declaration, #30 Exhibit CC to Weir Declaration, #31 Exhibit DD to Weir Declaration, #32 Exhibit EE to Weir Declaration, #33 Exhibit FF to Weir Declaration, #34 Exhibit GG to Weir Declaration, #35 Exhibit HH to Weir Declaration, #36 Exhibit II to Weir Declaration, #37 Exhibit JJ to Weir Declaration, #38 Exhibit KK to Weir Declaration, #39 Exhibit LL to Weir Declaration, #40 Exhibit MM to Weir Declaration, #41 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #42 Proposed Order) (Weir, Charles)
April 7, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #67 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donovan, William)
April 7, 2022 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Emilie E. O'Toole in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #67 filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS)(Donovan, William)
April 7, 2022 Filing 69 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #58 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
April 7, 2022 Filing 68 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #67 filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Donovan, William)
April 7, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Donovan, William)
April 7, 2022 Filing 66 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment #65 filed by Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc.. (Attorney William P Donovan, Jr added to party Ariel Haroush(pty:dft))(Donovan, William)
April 6, 2022 Filing 65 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Weisskopf, Stephen)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #63 Non-Resident Attorney Kamal H. Sleiman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Outform Inc, Defendant, designating William P. Donovan, Jr., as local counsel. (twdb)
March 23, 2022 Filing 63 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kamal H. Sleiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Outform, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/15/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32949436) filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Corrected Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kamal Sleiman) (Donovan, William)
March 16, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kamal H. Sleiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Outform, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32949436) #61 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
March 15, 2022 Filing 61 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kamal H. Sleiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Outform, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32949436) filed by defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Pro Hac Vice Application of Kamal H. Sleiman) (Donovan, William)
March 14, 2022 Filing 60 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: A motion has been filed in this case #58 . The parties are required to review Judge Spaeth's procedures page, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-autumn-d-spaeth, for important procedures regarding motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 12, 2022 Filing 59 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Outform, Inc. and Answers to Requests For Production Of Documents #58 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
March 12, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Outform, Inc. and Answers to Requests For Production Of Documents filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
February 14, 2022 Filing 57 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE TO 3/25/2022 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPINTOUCH, INC. #50 #51 . The parties stipulate to extend the discovery deadline for Motions to Compel to March 11, 2022. The Court therefore GRANTS IN PART Plaintiffs motion to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date #50 #51 . Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 56 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/25/2022 #50 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration CASE NO.: 8:21-CV-00840-DOC-ADS SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEPHEN D. WEISSKOPF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. PROC. 16 TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, #2 Exhibit Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #7 Exhibit Exhibit R, #8 Exhibit Exhibit S, #9 Exhibit Exhibit T)(Weisskopf, Stephen)
January 24, 2022 Filing 55 DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. PROC. 16 TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/25/2022 #50 filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Weir in support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 16 to Modify Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Charles E. Weir in support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 16 to Modify Scheduling Order)(Weir, Charles)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Stipulation for Protective Order #52 . (see document for details) (hr)
January 20, 2022 Filing 53 DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE COURTS SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 16 in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/25/2022 #51 filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles E. Weir in support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application to Modify the Courts Scheduling Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 16, #2 Exhibit 1)(Weir, Charles)
January 20, 2022 Filing 52 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush.(Hammond, Kate)
January 19, 2022 Filing 51 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/25/2022 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF STEPHEN D. WEISSKOPF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE COURTS SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 16, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT I, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT J, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT K, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT L, #14 Declaration DECLARATION OF WENDY BEVAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY THE COURTS SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 16, #15 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER UNDER FED. R. CIV. PROC. 16) (Weisskopf, Stephen)
January 17, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/25/2022 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen D. Weisskopf in Support of Plaintiff's Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 16 to Modify Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT I, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT J, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT K, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT L, #14 Declaration Declaration of Wendy Bevan in Support of Plaintiff's Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 16 to Modify Scheduling Order, #15 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 16 to Modify Scheduling Order) (Weisskopf, Stephen)
December 22, 2021 Filing 49 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #45 filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush.(Weir, Charles)
December 22, 2021 Filing 48 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #45 with JURY DEMAND Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Outform, Inc..(Donovan, William)
December 2, 2021 Filing 47 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. Exhibits A & B as to Amended Complaint/Petition #45 . (Weisskopf, Stephen)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Regarding Schedule for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' Responses #44 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 1, 2021 Filing 45 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint #24 , filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.(Weisskopf, Stephen)
November 29, 2021 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Order Re: Schedule for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint and Defendants Responses filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Stipulation Regarding Schedule For Plaintiff To File Second Amended Complaint and Defendants Responses)(Weir, Charles)
November 8, 2021 Filing 43 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS [26, 28]. The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs UCL claim against Defendant Haroush; DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs FAL claim against Defendant Haroush; DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs claim for injunctive relief under the UCL and the FAL against Defendant Outform; and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs breach of contract claim against Defendant Outform RE: #26 , #28 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Participation In Private Mediation filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Weir, Charles)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: JOINT REPORT REGARDING UPCOMING MEDIATION AND STIPULATION TO DEFERRULING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge David O. Carter: The Court having considered the Joint Report Regarding Upcoming Mediation and Stipulation to Defer Ruling on Motions to Dismiss submitted by plaintiff Spintouch, Inc. and defendants Outform, Inc., and Ariel Haroush and finding good cause ORDERS: 1. The parties will file a joint report no later than October 20, 2021 informing the Court whether the parties completed private mediation and if the parties reached a settlement. 2. Defendants' respective motions to dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 26 and 28) will remain under submission until at least October 21, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Upcoming Mediation and Stipulation To Defer Ruling On Motions To Dismiss filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Joint Report Regarding Upcoming Mediation and Stipulation To Defer Ruling On Motions To Dismiss)(Weir, Charles)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (twdb)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter. ( Fact Discovery cut-off 2/14/2022., Motions due by 5/5/2022, at 8:30 a.m., Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter., Jury Trial set for 7/19/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 8, 2021 Filing 37 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (Held and Completed) before Judge David O. Carter. The Courts Scheduling Order to be issued. The Court takes both Motions to Dismiss #26 and #28 under submission for 1 month while the parties go to mediation. The parties are ordered to submit a status report after mediation. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (twdb)
September 7, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason David Strabo counsel for Defendant Outform, Inc.. Adding Jason D. Strabo as counsel of record for Outform, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attorney Jason David Strabo added to party Outform, Inc.(pty:dft))(Strabo, Jason)
September 3, 2021 Filing 35 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge David O. Carter. The Court advances the in-person Scheduling Conference and Motions to Dismiss #26 #28 to SEPTEMBER 8, 2021, at 4:30 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 30, 2021 Filing 34 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc... (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 30, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #28 filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. (Weir, Charles)
August 30, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #26 filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Donovan, William)
August 23, 2021 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #28 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 23, 2021 Filing 30 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #26 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
August 6, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weir, Charles)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
August 6, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss FAC, #2 Proposed Order Granting Outform's Motion to Dismiss FAC) (Donovan, William)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #23 by Judge David O. Carter that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend to file its First Amended Complaint attached to the stipulation as Exhibit A. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Defendants shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of filing of the First Amended Complaint to file a response to the First Amended Complaint, including, but not limited to, a Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12 of the FRCP.FURTHER ORDERED that the First Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of the date this signed Order is transmitted via the CM/ECF system. (jp)
July 13, 2021 Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.(twdb)
July 12, 2021 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SpinTouch, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Weisskopf, Stephen)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Emilie O'Toole APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Outform Inc. Defendant, designating William P. Donovan, Jr. as local counsel. (twdb)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Campbell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Outform Inc. Defendant, designating William P. Donovan, Jr. as local counsel. (twdb)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Samantha L. Fenton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Outform Inc. Defendant, designating William P. Donovan, Jr. as local counsel. (twdb)
July 1, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emilie O'Toole to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Outform, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31566413) filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Pro Hac Vice Application of Emilie O'Toole) (Donovan, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Outform, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31566225) filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Application of Daniel R. Campbell) (Donovan, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samantha L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Outform, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31565947) filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Pro Hac Vice Application of Samantha L. Fenton) (Donovan, William)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ariel Haroush answer now due 7/12/2021, filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush.(Hammond, Kate)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ariel Haroush, identifying Rapid Displays, Inc.. (Attorney Kate Marie Hammond added to party Ariel Haroush(pty:dft))(Hammond, Kate)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #12 , #13 . The deadline for Outform to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to and including July 12, 2021. (twdb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 Corrected STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Outform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donovan, William)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Outform, Inc. answer now due 7/12/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Outform, Inc..(Donovan, William)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Outform, Inc. (Donovan, William)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Outform, Inc., identifying Rapid Displays, Inc.. (Donovan, William)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William P Donovan, Jr on behalf of Defendant Outform, Inc. (Attorney William P Donovan, Jr added to party Outform, Inc.(pty:dft))(Donovan, William)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ariel Haroush, Outform, Inc. (lh)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff spinTouch, Inc., (Weisskopf, Stephen)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant spinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff spinTouch, Inc.. (Weisskopf, Stephen)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31249146 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff spinTouch, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen D. Weisskopf added to party spinTouch, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Weisskopf, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SpinTouch, Inc. v. Outform, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outform, Inc.
Represented By: William P Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Daniel R. Campbell
Represented By: Emilie O'Toole
Represented By: Samantha L. Fenton
Represented By: Jason David Strabo
Represented By: Kamal H. Sleiman
Represented By: William P. Donovan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariel Haroush
Represented By: Charles E Weir
Represented By: Kate Marie Hammond
Represented By: Charles E. Weir
Represented By: William P Donovan, Jr
Represented By: William P. Donovan, Jr.
Represented By: Amy E. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SpinTouch, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Weisskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?