Diamond PEO, LLC et al v. Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: DIAMOND PEO, LLC and VL BEST PEO, INC.
Defendant: CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Petitioner: SKY HIGH PEO, LLC
Counter Defendant: Roes
Case Number: 8:2021cv00866
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 16, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John S Na on behalf of Counter Claimant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company, Defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company (Attorney John S Na added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:cc), Attorney John S Na added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:dft))(Na, John)
December 15, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of address by David R Ginsburg attorney for Plaintiff Diamond PEO, LLC. Changing attorneys address to 5900 Canoga Ave., Suite 450, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Filed by Plaintiff Diamond PEO, LLC. (Ginsburg, David)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (twdb)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER RE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter. ( Fact Discovery cut-off 1/13/2023., Motions due by (hearing date) 4/3/2023, at 8:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter., Jury Trial set for 6/13/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) Expert Cut-off Date: February 3, 2023. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 28, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (via ZOOM) (Held and Completed) before Judge David O. Carter. The Court adopts trial dates as proposed in Joint Report Rule 26(f) filed 9/13/2021 #23 . Scheduling order to issue. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
October 25, 2021 Filing 29 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: On the Court's own motion, the Zoom Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2021 has been ADVANCED to 10/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference Briefly to Allow More Time to Finalize Retention of Special Master #27 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Scheduling Conference is continued to November 1, 2021. (twdb)
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from October 6, 2021 Re: Scheduling Conference - optional html form,, Set/Reset Hearing, #26 filed by Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants Diamond PEO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING STIPULATION REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BRIEFLY TO ALLOW MORE TIME TO FINALIZE RETENTION OF SPECIAL MASTER)(Gjonola, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (Held and Continued) before Judge David O. Carter. Case is called. The Court and counsel confer. Parties are ordered to select a Special Master and have him/her present at next hearing. Scheduling Conference continued to 10/6/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Conduct Scheduling Conference Virtually #24 . (twdb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Stipulation to conduct scheduling Conference Virtually filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendants Diamond PEO, LLC, VL Best PEO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to conduct scheduling Conference Virtually)(Gjonola, Joseph)
September 13, 2021 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 weeks, filed by Plaintiffs Diamond PEO, LLC, Sky High PEO, LLC, VL Best PEO, Inc... (Gjonola, Joseph)
September 7, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Counterclaim #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: There is a caption for a Cross Claimant v. Cross Defendant. There is no cross claim included in document #20. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 3, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS Diamond PEO, LLC, Sky High PEO, LLC, VL Best PEO, Inc., identifying Diamond PEO, LLC, VL Best PEO, INC., Sky High PEO, LLC, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company, Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Gjonola, Joseph)
September 3, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Counterclaim, #15 filed by CROSS-DEFENDANTS Diamond PEO, LLC, VL Best PEO, Inc..(Gjonola, Joseph)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference #18 . ( Scheduling Conference continued to 9/27/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from AUGUST 30, 2021 to SEPTEMBER 27, 2021 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #14 filed by PLAINTIFFS Diamond PEO, LLC, Sky High PEO, LLC, VL Best PEO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gjonola, Joseph)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Counterclaim by Not More than 28 Days (30 days or less), #16 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Cross-Defendants to respond to the Counterclaim is extended to September 3, 2021. (twdb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Diamond PEO, LLC answer now due 9/3/2021; VL Best PEO, Inc. answer now due 9/3/2021, re Counterclaim, #15 filed by CROSS-DEFENDANTS Diamond PEO, LLC; VL Best PEO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gjonola, Joseph)
July 16, 2021 Filing 15 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendants All Plaintiffs, filed by Defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Parke, Margret)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company.(Parke, Margret)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #9 . Defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company answer due 7/17/2021 (twdb)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Leslie A Sheehan counsel for Defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Adding Leslie A. Sheehan as counsel of record for Defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Attorney Leslie A Sheehan added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:dft))(Sheehan, Leslie)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Margret G Parke on behalf of Defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company (Attorney Margret G Parke added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:dft))(Parke, Margret)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 7/16/21 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Desai, Asim)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company answer now due 6/16/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company.( Drugan, Margaret)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Asim K Desai on behalf of Defendant CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY (Attorney Asim K Desai added to party CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY(pty:dft))(Desai, Asim)
May 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, filed by Plaintiffs Diamond PEO, LLC, Sky High PEO, LLC, VL Best PEO, Inc. Filed in State Court on 4/6/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 . (car)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. ( Drugan, Margaret)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, identifying Delaware Life Insurance Company; Group One Thousand One, LLC. ( Drugan, Margaret)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2021-01194227 Receipt No: ACACDC-31264432 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit B - SUMMONS AND DOCUMENTS SERVED ON DEF) (Attorney Margaret M Drugan added to party CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY(pty:dft))( Drugan, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond PEO, LLC et al v. Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIAMOND PEO, LLC
Represented By: David R Ginsburg
Represented By: Joseph C Gjonola
Represented By: Michael B Adreani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VL BEST PEO, INC.
Represented By: David R Ginsburg
Represented By: Joseph C Gjonola
Represented By: Michael B Adreani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Margaret M Drugan
Represented By: Margret G Parke
Represented By: Asim K Desai
Represented By: Leslie A Sheehan
Represented By: John S Na
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SKY HIGH PEO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?