United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Wellness Matrix Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Wellness Matrix Group, Inc. and George Todt
Case Number: 8:2021cv01031
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Wellness Matrix Group, Inc (es)
July 29, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Wellness Matrix Group, Inc. filed by plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Application set for hearing on 8/30/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Qualls, Alyssa)
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to George Todt answer now due 8/24/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission.(Qualls, Alyssa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alyssa A. Qualls counsel for Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Michael J. Mueller is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alyssa A. Qualls. (Qualls, Alyssa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant George Todt served on 7/4/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon George Todt in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Qualls, Alyssa)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Wellness Matrix Group, Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barry Migliorini, CEO of Wellness Matrix Group, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Qualls, Alyssa)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 9/13/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/7/2021. (lb)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Moye APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Robert M. Moye, designating Donald W. Searles as local counsel. (es)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants George Todt and Wellness Matrix Group, Inc. (jtil)
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Moye to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Searles, Donald)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #5 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Mueller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission, designating Donald W. Searles as local counsel. (es)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #4 Non-Resident Attorney Alyssa A. Qualls APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission, designating Donald W. Searles as local counsel. (es)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Mueller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Searles, Donald)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alyssa A. Qualls to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Searles, Donald)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Searles, Donald)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Searles, Donald)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Donald W Searles added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Searles, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Wellness Matrix Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellness Matrix Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Todt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Donald W Searles
Represented By: Alyssa A. Qualls
Represented By: Michael J. Mueller
Represented By: Robert M. Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?