Onion Boy, Inc. v. Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Onion Boy, Inc., an Ohio corporation and Onion Boy, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Ortega, Mikes Farm and General Merchandise, Inc., an Arizona corporation, Michael (Mike) E Felix, III, Verde Fresh Produce, Inc., a California corporation, Mikes Bulk Dist. Inc., a California corporation, Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc., Verde Fresh Produce, Inc. and Mike's Farm and General Merchandise, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv01118
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
July 26, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc., Mike's Farm and General Merchandise, Inc., Michael Ortega, Verde Fresh Produce, Inc..(Verdi, Alfred)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 9/27/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/20/2021. (dca)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER #11 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court issues this Preliminary Injunction and ORDERS the following: SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. (es)
July 12, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTES OF VIDEO CONFERENCE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Hearing held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause is called for hearing via video conference. Motion is argued. The preliminary injunction is GRANTED. Counsel to submit the proposed preliminary injunction order. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PACA Trust Assets #11 [DE 20] filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case, #2 Exhibit B - Blue Book Listing)(Meuers, Lawrence)
July 9, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Ortega, mother, authorized to accept service at home address in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. -AMENDED to Include Due Diligence Affidavit [DE18] (Meuers, Lawrence)
July 9, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., upon Defendant Mike's Farm and General Merchandise, Inc. served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Ortega, authorized to accept service on behalf of statutory agent in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Meuers, Lawrence)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc., Mike's Farm and General Merchandise, Inc., Michael Ortega, Verde Fresh Produce, Inc., re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,, #20 served on July 8, 2021. (Verdi, Alfred)
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PACA Trust Assets #11 , Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Correct NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to PACA Trust Assets #9 #10 filed by Defendants Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc., Mike's Farm and General Merchandise, Inc., Michael Ortega, Verde Fresh Produce, Inc.. (Attorney Alfred J Verdi added to party Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alfred J Verdi added to party Mike's Farm and General Merchandise, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alfred J Verdi added to party Michael Ortega(pty:dft), Attorney Alfred J Verdi added to party Verde Fresh Produce, Inc.(pty:dft))(Verdi, Alfred)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., upon Defendant Verde Fresh Produce, Inc. served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Ortega, authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Meuers, Lawrence)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., upon Defendant Michael Ortega served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Ortega, authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Meuers, Lawrence)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., upon Defendant Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc. served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Areli Lopez, Manager of Carsal Tax Service, agent for service of process in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meuers, Lawrence)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC OR VIDEO APPEARANCE AT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING by Judge James V. Selna: the Court hereby grants the request of Lawrence H. Meuers, to appear via ZOOM video conference, at the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [DE 11], scheduled for July 12, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. Mr. Meuers shall be available at 239-325-2650 from 1:30 p.m., EDT, on July 12, 2021, or the Court will provide Plaintiff's Counsel with Zoom video conference information, by separate email communication. HEARING (es)
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST for Leave of Lawrence H. Meuers to Appear for Telephonically or Via Video Conference [DE 11] filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Meuers, Lawrence)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc., Mike's Farm and General Merchandise, Inc., Michael Ortega, Verde Fresh Produce, Inc.. (es)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #10 by Judge James V. Selna: This Court enters this Temporary Restraining Order on the 30th day of June, 2021, at 3:30 p.m. 9. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for July 12, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. 10. Defendants shall file any written response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than noon July 8. Plaintiff may file a reply to Defendants' response no later than noon July 9, 2021. [See document for details and deadlines.] (es)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Meuers, Lawrence)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re PACA Trust Assets filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Declaration in Support) (Meuers, Lawrence)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Correct NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to PACA Trust Assets #9 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to PACA Trust Assets filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit C - Certification of Counsel, #4 Proposed Order) (Meuers, Lawrence)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to PACA Trust Assets filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Counsel, #4 Proposed Order) (Meuers, Lawrence)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Meuers, Lawrence)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons M. Ortega, #2 Summons Verde Fresh Produce, #3 Summons Mike's Farm and General Merchandise)(Meuers, Lawrence)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Meuers, Lawrence)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31536176 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Onion Boy, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Attorney Lawrence H Meuers added to party Onion Boy, Inc., an Ohio corporation(pty:pla))(Meuers, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onion Boy, Inc. v. Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ortega
Represented By: Alfred J Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikes Farm and General Merchandise, Inc., an Arizona corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (Mike) E Felix, III
Represented By: Alfred J Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verde Fresh Produce, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikes Bulk Dist. Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike's Bulk Dist. Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verde Fresh Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike's Farm and General Merchandise, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onion Boy, Inc., an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Lawrence H Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onion Boy, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence H Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?