Joseph McClendon, III v. Combe Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joseph McClendon and Joseph McClendon, III
Defendant: Combe Incorporated, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc., Combe International LLC f/k/a Combe International LTD, Combe International LLC and Combe International LTD
Case Number: 8:2021cv01190
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Stephen G. Strauss APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Combe Incorporated, et al., defendants, designating Traci Choi as local counsel. (twdb)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Richard P. Cassetta APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Combe Incorporated, et al., defendants, designating Traci Choi as local counsel. (twdb)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Peter W. Bay APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Combe Incorporated, et al., defendants, designating Traci Choi as local counsel. (twdb)
August 6, 2021 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen G. Strauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31765119) filed by Defendants Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Choi, Traci)
August 6, 2021 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard P. Cassetta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31765066) filed by Defendant Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Choi, Traci)
August 6, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter W. Bay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31765029) filed by Defendants Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Choi, Traci)
July 27, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 26, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Traci G Choi on behalf of Defendants Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc. (Attorney Traci G Choi added to party Combe Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Traci G Choi added to party Combe International LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Traci G Choi added to party Combe Laboratories, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Traci G Choi added to party Combe Products, Inc.(pty:dft))(Choi, Traci)
July 22, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Combe Products, Inc.. upon Combe Products, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen G. Strauss. (Choi, Traci)
July 22, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Combe Laboratories, Inc.. upon Combe Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen G. Strauss. (Choi, Traci)
July 22, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Combe International LLC. upon Combe International LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen G. Strauss. (Choi, Traci)
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Combe Incorporated. upon Combe Incorporated waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen G. Strauss. (Choi, Traci)
July 14, 2021 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Combe Products, Inc. (iv)
July 14, 2021 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Combe Laboratories, Inc. (iv)
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Combe International LLC. (iv)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Combe Incorporated. (iv)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon, III. (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon, III. (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon, III. (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon, III. (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon, III, (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #2 , Summons Request #3 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon. (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon. (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon. (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon. (Rockstad, Trevor)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31606599 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Joseph McClendon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Trevor Bruce Rockstad added to party Joseph McClendon(pty:pla))(Rockstad, Trevor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph McClendon, III v. Combe Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McClendon
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McClendon, III
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Incorporated
Represented By: Traci G Choi
Represented By: Peter W. Bay
Represented By: Richard P. Cassetta
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Peter W. Bay
Represented By: Richard P. Cassetta
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Represented By: Traci G Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Products, Inc.
Represented By: Peter W. Bay
Represented By: Richard P. Cassetta
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Represented By: Traci G Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LLC f/k/a Combe International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LLC
Represented By: Peter W. Bay
Represented By: Richard P. Cassetta
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Represented By: Traci G Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LTD
Represented By: Peter W. Bay
Represented By: Richard P. Cassetta
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Represented By: Traci G Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?