Justina Carrasco v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justina Carrasco
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01202
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
2 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
3 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 39 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of Florida, 1:21-cv-22702 filed 7/27/2021. (iv)
July 23, 2021 Filing 38 Conditional Transfer Order - 4 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2989, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Judge Altonaga. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
July 22, 2021 Filing 37 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31678327) filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 21, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
July 21, 2021 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617719) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #7 #23 #30 Non-Resident Attorney Antony L. Ryan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. and for Robinhood Securities, LLC, designating Naeun Rim as local counsel. (lom)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini, APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. and for Robinhood Securities, LLC, designating Naeun Rim as local counsel. (lom)
July 19, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
July 16, 2021 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617719) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case PRO HAC VICE) (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 16, 2021 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617732) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case PRO HAC VICE) (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 16, 2021 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617739) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case PRO HAC VICE) (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 16, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
July 16, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NJ missing. (lt)
July 16, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
July 15, 2021 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617719) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 15, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617732) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 15, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 7/12/2021, Receipt No. 31617739) filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617739) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: There are 3 signature pages on this entry. (lt)
July 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617732) #7 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617719) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-00835-VAP-MRWx. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01202-VAP(MRWx). Signed by Judge Virginia A. Phillips (dta)
July 15, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robinhood Markets, Inc. answer now due 8/18/2021; Robinhood Securities, LLC answer now due 8/18/2021; Robinhood Financial LLC answer now due 8/18/2021, filed by Defendant Robinhood Markets, Inc.; Robinhood Securities, LLC; Robinhood Financial LLC.(Rutenberg, Craig)
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Regarding Document served on July 13, 2021. (Attachments: #1 POS Re Notice to Adverse Party and to Clerk of the Superior Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court)(Rutenberg, Craig)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Regarding Documents served on July 13, 2021. (Attachments: #1 POS Re Notice of Removal, #2 POS Re Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 POS Re Notice of Related Cases, #4 POS Re Notice of Interested Parties, #5 POS Re Notice of Pendency of Other Actions, #6 POS Re Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Craig Rutenberg), #7 POS RE Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Naeum Rim))(Rutenberg, Craig)
July 14, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Regarding Documents served on July 13, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Re Application for PHV (Kevin Orsini), #2 Proof of Service Re [PROPOSED] Order Re Application for PHV (Kevin Orsini), #3 Proof of Service re Application for PHV (Andrew Huynh), #4 Proof of Service Re [PROPOSED] Order Re Application for PHV (Andrew Huynh), #5 Proof of Service Re Application for PHV ( Anthony Ryan), #6 Proof of Service re [PROPOSED] Order Re Application for PHV (Anthony Ryan))(Rutenberg, Craig)
July 14, 2021 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:21-cv-01202 CJC (ADSx). (jtil)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Naeun Rim counsel for Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Adding Naeum Rim as counsel of record for Robinhood Financial LLC, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, et al.. (Attorney Naeun Rim added to party Robinhood Financial LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Naeun Rim added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Naeun Rim added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:dft))(Rim, Naeun)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig Steven Rutenberg counsel for Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. Adding Craig S. Rutenberg as counsel of record for Robinhood Financial LLC, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC, et al.. (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Justina Carrasco in Orange County Superior Court on 5/26/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617739) filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anthony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617732) filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31617719) filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Related Case(s): 21-CV- 00835-VAP-MRW, 21-CV- 00837-FMO, 21-CV-00843- CBM-E, 2:21-cv-02230 VAP, and 30-2021-01202793-CU-FR-CJC (Rutenberg, Craig)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01202793 Receipt No: ACACDC-31617487 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Craig Steven Rutenberg added to party ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Steven Rutenberg added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Steven Rutenberg added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:dft))(Rutenberg, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justina Carrasco v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justina Carrasco
Represented By: Michael Linzymiah Kennedy
Represented By: Paul Anthony Suppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Craig Steven Rutenberg
Represented By: Andrew D. Huynh
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Craig Steven Rutenberg
Represented By: Andrew D. Huynh
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Craig Steven Rutenberg
Represented By: Andrew D. Huynh
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?