Jeffrey Supinsky et al v. Kevin Richard Kelly, et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Supinsky and Valley East Building Management
Defendant: Kevin R. Kelly, Kevin Richard Kelly and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01388
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER [Dkt. 18] AND GRANTING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY RELATED TO GENERAL JURISDICTION #18 . The parties shall have until December 6, 2021 to conduct jurisdictional discovery. If Plaintiffs decide to amend their Complaint, they must do so by December 20, 2021. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 18, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Motion to Transfer #18 filed by Defendant Kevin Richard Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Hull, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric Hull)(Hull, Eric)
October 11, 2021 Filing 26 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Motion to Transfer #18 filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary K. Brucker, Jr. in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Transfer, #2 Proof of Service)(Brucker, Gary)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application Regarding Conducting Jurisdictional Discovery (Dkt. #23 ). (twdb)
September 27, 2021 Filing 24 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Discovery regarding Conducting Jurisdictional Discovery and to Continue Motion Hearing #23 filed by Defendant Kevin Richard Kelly. (Hull, Eric)
September 24, 2021 Filing 23 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Discovery regarding Conducting Jurisdictional Discovery and to Continue Motion Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brucker, Gary)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Randy S. Zelin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Supinsky et al., Plaintiffs, designating John L. Barber as local counsel. Granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Randy S. Zelin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Supinsky et al., Plaintiffs, designating John L. Barber as local counsel. (twdb)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Michael T. Contos APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Supinsky et al., Plaintiffs, designating John L. Barber as local counsel. Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Michael T. Contos APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Supinsky et al., Plaintiffs, designating John L. Barber as local counsel. (twdb)
September 21, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on December 2, 2021. (rrp)
September 20, 2021 Filing 19 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kevin Richard Kelly, identifying Kevin Kelly and Benchmark Investments, LLC. (Hull, Eric)
September 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Motion to Transfer filed by Defendant Kevin Richard Kelly. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Eric Hull, #3 Declaration Declaration of Kevin Kelly) (Hull, Eric)
September 20, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Randy S. Zelin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/16/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31995486) filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management. (Brucker, Gary)
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael T. Contos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/15/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31986569) filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management. (Brucker, Gary)
September 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Randy S. Zelin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31995486) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael T. Contos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31986569) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Randy S. Zelin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31995486) filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management. (Brucker, Gary)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael T. Contos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31986569) filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management. (Brucker, Gary)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kevin Richard Kelly answer now due 9/20/2021, filed by Defendant Kevin Richard Kelly.(Hull, Eric)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Brucker, Gary)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kevin Richard Kelly answer now due 9/9/2021, filed by Defendant Kevin Richard Kelly.(Hull, Eric)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Document Nos. 4, 6, and 7 filed by Defendants Kevin Richard Kelly. (Hull, Eric)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Randy Zelin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
August 23, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management, upon Defendant Kevin Richard Kelly served on 7/24/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kevin Richard Kelly, defendant, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 7/26/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 6) (esa)
August 23, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Kevin Richard Kelly Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Jeffrey Supinsky, Valley East Building Management. (filed in state court 7/16/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kevin R. Kelly, (Hull, Eric)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Kevin R. Kelly. (Hull, Eric)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01210778 Receipt No: ACACDC-31858494 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant's Kevin R. Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Payment Receipt, #4 Exhibit Notice of Hearing Case Management Conference, #5 Exhibit Summons to Jeffrey Supinsky, #6 Exhibit Proof of Service, #7 Exhibit Notice of Relocation, #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence) (Attorney Eric Blair Hull added to party Kevin R. Kelly(pty:dft))(Hull, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey Supinsky et al v. Kevin Richard Kelly, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Supinsky
Represented By: Gary K Brucker, Jr
Represented By: John L Barber
Represented By: Michael T. Contos
Represented By: Randy S. Zelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley East Building Management
Represented By: Gary K Brucker, Jr
Represented By: John L Barber
Represented By: Michael T. Contos
Represented By: Randy S. Zelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin R. Kelly
Represented By: Eric Blair Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Richard Kelly
Represented By: Eric Blair Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?