Patricia A. O'Brien v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia A O'Brien
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Stead Motors Inc. doing business as Walnut Creek Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01391
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: James V Selna
2 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Joint Stipulation to Resolve Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Request for Entry of Judgment #25 . The Court hereby enters judgment in the amount of $16,000, payable to Plaintiff's counsel within 60 days. (twdb)
January 26, 2022 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $16,000 filed by Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Resolve Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses & Request for Entry of Judgment)(Clark, Jason)
January 14, 2022 Filing 24 JUDGMENT ENTERING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO TERMS OF RULE 68 OFFER (Dkt. No. 20) by Judge Cormac J. Carney, in favor of Patricia A O'Brien against FCA US LLC. FCA shall pay, Plaintiff Patricia O'Brien $85,806.18 to settle her claims against FCA for the 2015 Jeep Cherokee Limited. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Related to: Notice (Other) #20 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
January 11, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason Patrick Clark on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien (Attorney Jason Patrick Clark added to party Patricia A O'Brien(pty:pla))(Clark, Jason)
January 7, 2022 Filing 22 State Court Conformed Request for Dismissal re Dealer Completly filed by Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien re: Order to Show Cause, #21 (Law, Daniel)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (REMOVAL) AS TO DEFENDANT STEAD MOTORS INC., by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/11/2022. (twdb)
December 30, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Acceptance of Defendant's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 filed by Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien. (Law, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue 10/28/21 Scheduling Order Issuance Date #18 . NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The Scheduling Order Issuance Date is continued to 1/6/22. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Order Issuance Date from October 28, 2021 to at least forty-five (45) days from October 28, 2021 filed by Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue October 28, 2021 Scheduling Order Issuance Date, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue October 28, 2021 Scheduling Order Issuance Date)(Law, Daniel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Patricia A O'Brien(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on October 28, 2021. (rrp)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01391-CJC-(ADSx). (eva)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #9 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #10 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #8 served on August 25, 2021. (Azemoon, Ali)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Trina M Clayton on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Trina M Clayton added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Clayton, Trina)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Vilchez, Katherine)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings, LLC, FCA Holdco B.V., Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01186302-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-31861920 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hugret iso Removal, #2 Declaration of Ali Azemoon iso Removal, #3 Exhibit A to AA Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to AA Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to AA Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to AA Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to AA Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to AA Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to AA Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to AA Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to AA Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to AA Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to AA Declaration, #14 Exhibit L to AA Declaration, #15 Exhibit M to AA Declaration, #16 Exhibit N to AA Declaration, #17 Exhibit O to AA Declaration, #18 Exhibit P to AA Declaration, #19 Exhibit Q to AA Declaration, #20 Exhibit R to AA Declaration, #21 Exhibit S to AA Declaration, #22 Exhibit T to AA Declaration, #23 Exhibit U to AA Declaration, #24 Exhibit V to AA Declaration, #25 Exhibit W to AA Declaration, #26 Exhibit Wa to AA Declaration, #27 Exhibit X to AA Declaration, #28 Exhibit Y to AA Declaration, #29 Exhibit Z to AA Declaration, #30 Exhibit AA to AA Declaration, #31 Exhibit BB to AA Declaration, #32 Exhibit CC to AA Declaration, #33 Exhibit DD to AA Declaration, #34 Exhibit EE to AA Declaration, #35 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Azemoon, Ali)
August 24, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC in Orange County Superior Court on 5/14/2021, attached as Exhibit K. (jtil)
August 24, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Patricia A O'Brien in Orange County Superior Court on 2/26/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia A. O'Brien v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A O'Brien
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Jason Patrick Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina M Clayton
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stead Motors Inc. doing business as Walnut Creek Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?