Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tellone Management Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Tellone Management Group, Inc., Dean Tellone, Steven Wolfe and Robert Gumerman
Case Number: 8:2021cv01413
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
2 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (dca)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:21-cv-01413 JLS(ADSx). (rn)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. The Plaintiff does not consent. (Longo, Amy)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Steven Wolfe waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Nick Morgan. (Longo, Amy)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Dean Tellone waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Nick Morgan. (Longo, Amy)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Tellone Management Group, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Nick Morgan. (Longo, Amy)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Robert Gumerman, Dean Tellone, Tellone Management Group, Inc., Steven Wolfe. (esa)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Judgment as to Robert Gumerman filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order as to judgement regarding defendant Robert Gumerman)(Longo, Amy)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Amy J. Longo added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Longo, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tellone Management Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amy J. Longo
Represented By: Yolanda Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tellone Management Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Tellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gumerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?