Russell Sigler, Inc. v. Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC et al
Petitioner: Russell Sigler, Inc.
Respondent: Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC and Adam Helliwell
Case Number: 8:2021cv01441
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES (Doc. #1 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the Petition To Compel Compliance With Arbitrator Summonses (Doc. 1) filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc. against Respondents Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC and Adam Helliwell is dismissed without prejudice with each side bearing its own costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Denying Motion by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: denying #13 Motion to Compel. Based on the Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court finds the Motion (Dkt. 13) is now moot, DENIES the Motion on that basis, and vacates the hearing on the Motion. (hr)
September 30, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Glassman, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc., re MOTION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES #13 Adam Helliwell served on 9/15/2021. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc., re MOTION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES #13 Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC served on 9/15/2021. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Russell Sigler, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adam Helliwell - self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Russell Sigler, Inc., upon Defendant Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 'Jane Doe' - Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 21 Opposition to re: MOTION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES #13 filed by Respondents Adam Helliwell, Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John T. Rosenthal, Esq. in Support of Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator Summonses, #2 Declaration of Greg A. Garbacz, Esq. in Support of Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator Summonses)(Attorney John T A Rosenthal added to party Adam Helliwell(pty:res), Attorney John T A Rosenthal added to party Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC(pty:res))(Rosenthal, John)
September 28, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Order Denying Ex Parte Motion #17 .(see document for details) (mba)
September 27, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to 10/7/2021 #17 filed by Respondents Adam Helliwell, Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Declaration Declaration in support of Response to Motion Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator Summonses, #3 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gregory A Garbacz added to party Adam Helliwell(pty:res), Attorney Gregory A Garbacz added to party Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC(pty:res))(Garbacz, Gregory)
September 27, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #15 , #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect statute prompt of FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) selected...service was NOT made on the Clerks Office of USDC. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
September 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to 10/7/2021 filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/14/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Russell Sigler, Inc., upon Defendant Adam Helliwell served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Russell Sigler, Inc., upon Defendant Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Re-Setting Hearing on Motion #13 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. As the motion relates to discovery matters, it is to "be noticed for hearing before the assigned magistrate judge." As such, barring further order, the Motion will be heard on October 14, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge John D. Early in Courtroom 6A of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse, located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California. (see document for further details) (hr)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Glassman, #2 Exhibit 1 in support of Declaration of Daniel Glassman, #3 Exhibit 2 in support of Declaration of Daniel Glassman, #4 Exhibit 3 in support of Declaration of Daniel Glassman, #5 Exhibit 4 in support of Declaration of Daniel Glassman, #6 Proposed Order)(Glassman, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Respondent Adam Helliwell. (jp)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC. (jp)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc., (Glassman, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. (Glassman, Daniel)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The case initiating document such as the Civil Cover Sheet was incorrectly filed as an attachment. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Requests were filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events > Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator Summonses Receipt No: ACACDC-31921881 - Fee: $402, filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC, #2 Summons to Adam Helliwell, #3 Declaration of Daniel Glassman, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Daniel M Glassman added to party Russell Sigler, Inc.(pty:pet))(Glassman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell Sigler, Inc. v. Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Sigler, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Glassman
Represented By: Carter Lee Norfleet
Represented By: J David Bournazian
Represented By: Jonathan Peter Hersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC
Represented By: Gregory A Garbacz
Represented By: John T A Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adam Helliwell
Represented By: Gregory A Garbacz
Represented By: John T A Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?