Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc. et al v. SC Cheer Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc. and Jeffery Dohrman
Defendant: SC Cheer Company, LLC, Jordan Alcazar and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Counter Claimant: Nikki Little-Alcazar
Case Number: 8:2021cv01457
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE. The Court, having been notified by Status Report that this action has been settled #22 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders ALL proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. (twdb)
May 31, 2022 Filing 39 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lom)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court, having been notified by Plaintiff that this action has been settled #37 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders ALL proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
May 31, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.. (Welch, Kevin)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Order Dismissing Civil Case. The Court, having been notified by Minute Order that this action has been settled #35 , hereby orders the parties file a Notice of Settlement on or before June 1, 2022. The Court hereby orders ALL proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. re: Settlement Conference #35 . (twdb)
May 26, 2022 Filing 35 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Case is called for a settlement conference. Appearances entered on the record. Settlement discussions are held off the record. A settlement is reached and the material terms on placed on the record. The transcript of this portion of the proceedings is ordered sealed, to be obtained only by court order. Parties shall file a Notice of Settlement shall be filed within five court days. Court Recorder: CS 05/26/2022. (kh)
April 14, 2022 Filing 34 MINUTES OF PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALL held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Telephone Conference held. By agreement, the Settlement Conference presently set for May 12, 2022 is continued to May 26, 2022 at 10:00am in Courtroom 6B. Court Recorder: Not Recorded. (kh)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. Discovery cut-off 11/7/2022. Motions due by 1/9/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2023 08:30 AM and Jury Trial set for 3/21/2023 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/2/2022. (kdu)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. Discovery cut-off 11/7/2022. Motions due by 1/9/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2023 08:30 AM and Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
February 28, 2022 Filing 30 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. Status conference re discovery progress is set for June 27, 2022 at 8:30 AM. The Courts scheduling order to issue. Status Conference set for 6/27/2022 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Settlement Conference is placed on calendar for May 12, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6B, 6th Floor, 411 W. Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California, 92701. No later than five (5) days prior to the Settlement Conference, each party shall submit a Confidential Settlement Conference Statement directly to the Chambers of Judge Spaeth via email to ADS_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. The Statements should not be filed with the Clerk of the Court and they will not be made part of the casefile. **See Order for details** (kh)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. This matter, having been referred for settlement conference before Judge Spaeth by Judge Carter, is set for a Pre-Settlement Conference Call on April 14, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. Call in information shall be provided by separate email. ***NOTE: During the telephone hearing, counsel must identify themselves before they speak for the benefit of the Court.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 25, 2022 Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2022 has been rescheduled to 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. **TIME CHANGE ONLY**THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 22, 2022 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Counter Defendant Jeffery Dohrman, Plaintiffs Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc... (Welch, Kevin)
February 18, 2022 Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING Plaintiffs' #22 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-caims. As such, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion and VACATES the hearing scheduled for February 28, 2022. The Court will permit Plaintiffs to bring this Motion at a later point so long as they have met the local rule requirements. The Court will still hold the Scheduling Conference on February 28, 2022 as planned. (twdb)
February 7, 2022 Filing 24 Opposition to Counter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' and Counter-Plaintiffs' Counterclaims #22 filed by Defendant SC Cheer Company, LLC. (Yoshida, David)
January 26, 2022 Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Scheduling Conference #18 set for 2/23/2022 is rescheduled to 2/28/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 25, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' and Counter-Plaintiffs' Counterclaims filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Welch, Kevin)
January 4, 2022 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.; Jury Demand, filed by Counter Claimant Nikki Little-Alcazar, SC Cheer Company, LLC, Jordan Alcazar. (Included in #21 Answer and Counterclaim) (Attorney Steven C Valerio added to party Jordan Alcazar(pty:dft), Attorney Steven C Valerio added to party Nikki Little-Alcazar(pty:dft), Attorney Steven C Valerio added to party SC Cheer Company, LLC(pty:dft)) (twdb)
January 4, 2022 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND QUANTUM MERUIT filed by Defendants Jordan Alcazar, Nikki Little-Alcazar, SC Cheer Company, LLC. (Bradley, Kaila)
December 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, (Bradley, Kaila)
December 15, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
December 14, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant SC Cheer Company, LLC.(Attorney Kaila Michelle Bradley added to party SC Cheer Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Bradley, Kaila) Modified on 12/15/2021 (twdb).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 16, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc., Jeffery Dohrman. upon Jordan Alcazar waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021; Nikki Little-Alcazar waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021; SC Cheer Company, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David Yoshida. (Welch, Kevin)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant SC Cheer Company, LLC. (twdb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Jordan Alcazar, Nikki Little-Alcazar. (twdb)
September 12, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.. (Welch, Kevin)
September 12, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.. (Welch, Kevin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.. (Welch, Kevin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.. (Welch, Kevin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.. (Welch, Kevin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.. (Welch, Kevin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plantiffs Jeffery Dohrman, Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc., (Welch, Kevin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31933490 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc., Jeffery Dohrman. (Attorney Kevin Matthew Welch added to party Jeffery Dohrman(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Matthew Welch added to party Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.(pty:pla))(Welch, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc. et al v. SC Cheer Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Cheer, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Dohrman
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Cheer Company, LLC
Represented By: Kaila Michelle Bradley
Represented By: David Yuji Yoshida
Represented By: Steven C Valerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Alcazar
Represented By: Steven C Valerio
Represented By: David Yuji Yoshida
Represented By: Kaila Michelle Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Nikki Little-Alcazar
Represented By: Steven C Valerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?