Laurence Cherniak v. John Doe 1 et al
Plaintiff: Laurence Cherniak
Defendant: John Doe 1 doing business as Warm and Cozy Home Fashion, John Doe 2 doing business as MyBlanketGuy, John Doe 3 doing business as El Toro, John Doe 4 doing business as N/D doing business as HFNEJE and John Doe 5 doing business as HANYONGRONG doing business as FDGJNB
Case Number: 8:2021cv01523
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 14, 2021 Filing 24 SUBPOENA IN A CIVIL CASE Issued as to Amazon.com Services LLC. (hr)
October 14, 2021 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (McCulloch, Kevin)
October 14, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT SUBPOENA with filing fee previously paid ($49 paid on 10/06/2021, receipt number 32109723), filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Screen Captures, #2 notification of claimed infringement)(McCulloch, Kevin)
October 13, 2021 Filing 21 FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION granting Motion #5 re: #20 Order Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (iv)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin McCulloch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak, designating Andrew Delahunt as local counsel #15 . (iv)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE (In Chambers) Order re Request for Issuance of Subpoena by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re: Request for Subpoena to Identify Infringer (DMCA) #16 , #17 . The Request (Dkt. 16) is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff submitting a new request for subpoena under 17 U.S.C. 512(h), with a compliance date providing at least 21 days for compliance by Amazon. (see document for further details) (hr)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REFERRING REQUESTS FOR SUBPOENAS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE [16, 17]; re: MISC - Subpoena to Identify Infringer (DMCA), #16 , Subpoena Request (AO 88) #17 . (twdb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Delahunt, Andrew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT SUBPOENA Receipt No: ACACDC-32109723 - Fee: $49, filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Screen Captures, #2 notification of claimed infringement)(Delahunt, Andrew)
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P. McCulloch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/16/2021, Receipt No. 31996850) filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCulloch, Kevin)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P. McCulloch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/16/2021, Receipt No. 31996850) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. (lt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5. (twdb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P. McCulloch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/16/2021, Receipt No. 31996850) filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCulloch, Kevin)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P. McCulloch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31996850) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application not a Noticed Motion. The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Delahunt, Andrew)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please remove et al from the caption of the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin P. McCulloch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31996850) filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kevin P. McCulloch added to party Laurence Cherniak(pty:pla)) (McCulloch, Kevin)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Delahunt, Andrew)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Laurence Cherniak. (Delahunt, Andrew)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Delahunt, Andrew)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31995438 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Laurence Cherniak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Artwork, #2 Exhibit 2 - Screen Captures) (Attorney Andrew Delahunt added to party Laurence Cherniak(pty:pla))(Delahunt, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurence Cherniak v. John Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Cherniak
Represented By: Kevin P. McCulloch
Represented By: Andrew Delahunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 doing business as Warm and Cozy Home Fashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2 doing business as MyBlanketGuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3 doing business as El Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4 doing business as N/D doing business as HFNEJE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 5 doing business as HANYONGRONG doing business as FDGJNB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?